blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0743817

EP0743817 - CUTTING DEVICE FOR GARDENING AND HORTICULTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/48]CUTTING DEVICE FOR GARDENING AND HORTICULTURE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING IT
[1998/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.1999
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.10.1999 [1999/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEX S.P.A.
Via Lago Maggiore, 24
36015 Schio (Vicenza) / IT
[1998/42]
Former [1996/48]For all designated states
VALEX S.P.A.
Via Lago Maggiore, 24
I-36015 Schio, Vicenza / IT
Inventor(s)01 / ANZOLIN, Bruno
Via Martiri della Libertà, 4
I-36030 San Vito di Leguzzano / IT
[1996/48]
Representative(s)Forattini, Amelia
Internazionale Brevetti
Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l.
Piazza Castello 1
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1996/48]Forattini, Amelia
c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date95909701.510.02.1995
[1996/48]
WO1995EP00477
Priority number, dateIT1994VI0002111.02.1994         Original published format: IT VI940021
[1996/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9521521
Date:17.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0743817
Date:27.11.1996
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1996/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0743817
Date:14.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.08.1995
ClassificationIPC:A01G3/053
[1996/48]
CPC:
A01G3/053 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [1996/48]
TitleGerman:SCHNEIDEVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN GARTENBAU[1998/42]
English:CUTTING DEVICE FOR GARDENING AND HORTICULTURE[1998/42]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TAILLE UTILISE EN JARDINAGE ET EN HORTICULTURE[1998/42]
Former [1996/48]SCHNEIDEVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN GARTENBAU, UND VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG
Former [1996/48]CUTTING DEVICE FOR GARDENING AND HORTICULTURE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING IT
Former [1996/48]DISPOSITIF DE TAILLE UTILISE EN JARDINAGE ET EN HORTICULTURE, ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION
Entry into regional phase26.07.1996National basic fee paid 
26.07.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/48]
29.11.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.04.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.1998Fee for grant paid
07.07.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.07.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[AD]FR2122473  (ROCKWELL MFG CO) [AD] 1,3,6,7 * figures 11-15 *;
 [YA]FR2409690  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * figures 3,4 * [A] 1,2,6,7;
 [A]EP0160420  (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4-7 * figure - *;
 [A]GB2189179  (SCINTILLA AG) [A] 1,2,6,8 * the whole document *;
 [XA]EP0465117  (BLOUNT INC [US]) [X] 8,9,11 * column 3, line 43 - column 5, line 15; figure - * [A] 1-7,10;
 [XAY]EP0492746  (EMERSON ELECTRIC CO [NL]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column 3, line 2 - line 20; figure 3 * [A] 8 [Y] 4,5;
 [AD]DE4224665  (ATLAS COPCO ELEKTROWERKZEUGE [DE]) [AD] 1,6,7* figures 2-6 *;
 [XP]EP0635200  (BLOUNT INC [US]) [XP] 1-3,6,7 * figures 1-3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.