Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0819646

EP0819646 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THE SPEED OF A WINCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.09.2000
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2000Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.11.2000 [2000/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KOMATSU LTD.
3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107 / JP
For all designated states
KOMATSU MEC KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-6, Akasaka 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/04]For all designated states
KOMATSU LTD.
3-6, Akasaka 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 107 / JP
For all designated states
KOMATSU MEC KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-6, Akasaka 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MORI, Kinya, Komatsu Mec Main Plant
9, Minamidai 1-chome
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama 350-11 / JP
[1998/04]
Representative(s)Meissner, Peter E. , et al
Meissner & Meissner
Patentanwaltsbüro
Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/04]Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date95910783.010.03.1995
[1998/04]
WO1995JP00394
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9628377
Date:19.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0819646
Date:21.01.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996
[1998/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.09.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B66D1/44
[1998/04]
Designated contracting statesDE [1998/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM GESWINDIGKEITSREGELUNG EINER WINDE[1998/04]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THE SPEED OF A WINCH[1998/04]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR CONTROLER LA VITESSE D'UN TREUIL[1998/04]
Entry into regional phase26.09.1997Translation filed 
26.09.1997National basic fee paid 
26.09.1997Search fee paid 
26.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
26.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/04]
18.09.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US5355675  (MAYHUGH JOEL M [US], et al) [X] 1 * column W * [A] 5,10,11 [Y] 4;
 [Y]US3870255  (LEMONT HAROLD EDMINSTON) [Y] 4 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 12 *
International search[A]JPS5554712Y  ;
 [A]JPH037599B  ;
 [A]JPS61127968  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY);
 [A]JPS62105895  (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES);
 [A]JPH0357033B  ;
 [A]JPS5958203  (YANASE KK);
 [A]JPS6153318B