Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0795078

EP0795078 - METHOD FOR SUPPLYING VAPOUR TO THE INTAKE AIR OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 27.11.2013  [2013/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Munters Euroform GmbH
Süsterfeldstrasse 65
52072 Aachen / DE
[2000/34]
Former [1997/38]For all designated states
Rosén, Per
Tullgatan 1A, II
223 54 Lund / SE
For all designated states
Olsson, Lars-Ola
Utsättaregränd 207
226 47 Lund / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Rosén, Per
Tullgatan 1A, II
223 54 Lunde / SE
02 / Olsson, Lars-Ola
Utsättaregränd 207
226 47 Lund / SE
[2000/34]
Former [1997/38]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Mörikestrasse 18
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/38]Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons
Mörikestrasse 18
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date95910832.516.01.1995
[1997/38]
WO1995SE00026
Priority number, dateSE1994000065225.02.1994         Original published format: SE 9400652
[1997/38]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9523286
Date:31.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0795078
Date:17.09.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.1995
[1997/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0795078
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE31.08.1995
ClassificationInternational:F02M25/035
[1997/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/38]
Extension statesLT23.09.1996
SI23.09.1996
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ZUFÜHREN VON DAMPF ZUR EINLASSLUFT EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE UND VORRICHTUNG DAZU[1997/38]
English:METHOD FOR SUPPLYING VAPOUR TO THE INTAKE AIR OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND DEVICE THEREFOR[1997/38]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN VAPEUR DE L'AIR D'ADMISSION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE[1997/38]
Entry into regional phase31.08.1995Translation filed 
23.09.1996National basic fee paid 
23.09.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
25.09.1996Examination requested  [1997/38]
02.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.1999Fee for grant paid
30.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE12.07.2000
GR14.07.2000
[2013/48]
Former [2004/51]SE12.07.2000
GR14.07.2000
Former [2001/26]SE12.07.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]US4423704  (PERSINGER JAMES G [US]);
 [A]SU1236132
 [A]  - DERWENT'S ABSTRACT, No. 87-35653/05, Week 8705; & SU,A,1 236 132 (KRIVOV VG), 7 June 1986.,