Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0744893

EP0744893 - PESTICIDE ADJUVANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Patent Dept., CHAd-0377, AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park
IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/51]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Patent Dept., CHAd-0377, AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US
Former [1996/49]For all designated states
NOVO NORDISK ENTOTECH, INC.
1497 Drew Avenue
Davis, CA 95616-4880 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HOBBS, David, G.
1414 Rosario Street
Davis, CA 95616 / US
[1996/49]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/49]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date95910976.013.02.1995
[1996/49]
WO1995US01760
Priority number, dateUS1994019802917.02.1994         Original published format: US 198029
US1995038235201.02.1995         Original published format: US 382352
[1996/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9522253
Date:24.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0744893
Date:04.12.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.1995
[1996/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0744893
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.08.1995
ClassificationInternational:A01N25/22, A01N63/00, // (A01N63/00, 25:22, 25:00)
[1996/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/49]
TitleGerman:PESTIZID ZUSATZ[1996/49]
English:PESTICIDE ADJUVANT[1996/49]
French:ADJUVANT DE PESTICIDE[1996/49]
Entry into regional phase17.07.1996National basic fee paid 
17.07.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/49]
10.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.1999Fee for grant paid
24.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
FR12.04.2000
IT12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
DE13.07.2000
GR14.07.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
FR12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
DE13.07.2000
GR14.07.2000
Former [2004/51]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
DE13.07.2000
GR14.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2003/45]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
DE13.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2003/08]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
DE13.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2002/26]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
DE13.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2002/13]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
DE13.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2002/02]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2001/26]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2001/16]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2001/11]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS62120301  ;
 JPS485936  [ ] (KUMIAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY);
 [X]JPS5337750  ;
 [A]WO9219102  (LIM LAB INC [US]) [A] 1-37 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2312195  (WESTVACO CORP [US]) [A] 1-37 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 21 *;
 [A]US3393990  (GEARY ROBERT J) [A] 1-37 * column 1, line 10 - line 30 * * column 2, line 64 - column 5, line 24 *;
 [A]EP0250751  (STRAHLEN UMWELTFORSCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-37 * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * claims 1,3 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871114), vol. 11, no. 349, Database accession no. (C - 456), & JP62120301 A 19870601 (HOKKO CHEM IND) [X] 1-3,13,19,25,26 * abstract *
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19731126), vol. 79, no. 21, Database accession no. 122557 [X] 1-5,13,15,19-21,25-28 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 78, no. 20, Database accession no. 78-35830A [20], & JPS5337750 A 19780407 (NAKAJIMA) [X] 1-3,7,8 * abstract *
ExaminationSU1678802
 US3619222