Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0746359

EP0746359 - CATHETER CHECK VALVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VADUS, Inc.
2323 Green Road
Ann Arbor, MI 48105-1530 / US
[1998/35]
Former [1996/50]For all designated states
AEROQUIP CORPORATION
3000 Strayer Road, P.O. Box 50
Maumee, Ohio 43537-0050 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROGERS, Russell, L.
602 South Main Street
Munith, MI 49259 / US
02 / FOURNIER, Paul, J., F.
3339 Hendee Road
Jackson, MI 49201 / US
03 / CHALLENDER, Gary, B.
3500 Mount Hope Road
Grass Lake, MI 49240 / US
[1996/50]
Representative(s)Gleiss, Alf-Olav , et al
Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]Gleiss, Alf-Olav, Dr.jur. Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Gleiss & Grosse Patentanwaltskanzlei Maybachstrasse 6A
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1996/50]Gleiss, Alf-Olav, Dr.jur. Dipl.-Ing.
Gleiss & Grosse Patentanwaltskanzlei Maybachstrasse 6A
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date95911044.617.02.1995
[1996/50]
WO1995US02070
Priority number, dateUS1994019971322.02.1994         Original published format: US 199713
[1996/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9522364
Date:24.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0746359
Date:11.12.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.1995
[1996/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0746359
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.08.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61M39/26, A61M39/06
[1997/34]
Former International [1996/50]A61M5/178
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/50]
TitleGerman:EINHEIT AUS KATHETER UND RÜCKSCHLAGVENTIL[1996/50]
English:CATHETER CHECK VALVE ASSEMBLY[1996/50]
French:ENSEMBLE SOUPAPE DE NON RETOUR DE CATHETER[1996/50]
Entry into regional phase06.08.1996National basic fee paid 
06.08.1996Search fee paid 
06.08.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/51]
23.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2002Fee for grant paid
11.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
02.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.199703   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.1997
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US5195980  (CATLIN DAVID G [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * figures 1,1A; claims 1,5,7,8 * [A] 6 [Y] 3,4,7;
 [YA]US4842591  (LUTHER RONALD B [US]) [Y] 3,4,7 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 3; figure 2 * [A] 6,10;
 [A]EP0051718  (INTERMEDICAT GMBH [CH]) [A] 1-4,6 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0332884  (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,6 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0496724  (DIERINGER FRANZ A [AT]) [A] 5,6,8 * page 4, line 21 - line 22 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0329038  (HABLEY MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [A] 9 * column 6, line 19 - line 23 * * figures 1,2 *
International search[A]US5156596  (BALBIERZ DANIEL J [US], et al);
 [A]US5176651  (ALLGOOD FRED A [US], et al)