Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0697139

EP0697139 - HAND-HELD TRANSMITTING AND/OR RECEIVING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telit Mobile Terminals S.p.A.
Viale Stazione di Prosecco, 5/b
34010 Sgonico (Trieste) / IT
[2001/21]
Former [1999/05]For all designated states
Telital S.p.A.
Viale Stazione di Prosecco, 5/b
34010 Sgonico (Trieste) / IT
Former [1996/26]For all designated states
Hagenuk Telecom GmbH
Westring 431
24118 Kiel / DE
Former [1996/08]For all designated states
CETELCO CELLULAR TELEPHONE COMPANY A/S
Ostre Allé 6
DK-9530 Stovring / DK
Inventor(s)01 / PEDERSEN, Gert, Fr lund
Egense Hj rnet 25
DK-9280 Storvorde / DK
02 / THOMSEN, Jan, Gert
sterbro 80, 3. th.
DK-9000 Aalborg / DK
[1996/08]
Representative(s)Hansmann, Dierk , et al
Patentanwälte
Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann
Jessenstrasse 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/26]Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
Former [1996/08]Drömer, Hans-Carsten , et al
Preussag AG, Patente und Lizenzen, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 4
D-30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date95911297.006.03.1995
[1996/08]
WO1995EP00813
Priority number, dateDK1994000026708.03.1994         Original published format: DK 26794
[1996/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9524746
Date:14.09.1995
[1995/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0697139
Date:21.02.1996
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.1995
[1996/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0697139
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/24, H01Q9/04
[1996/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/36]
Former [1996/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:TRAGBARES SENDE- UND/ODER EMPFANGSGERÄT[1996/08]
English:HAND-HELD TRANSMITTING AND/OR RECEIVING APPARATUS[1996/08]
French:APPAREIL EMETTEUR ET/OU RECEPTEUR PORTATIF[1996/08]
Entry into regional phase30.11.1995National basic fee paid 
30.11.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/08]
10.12.1995Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.04.1996Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
29.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2002Fee for grant paid
04.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Request for further processing for:26.05.2000Request for further processing filed
26.05.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.06.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
08.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.01.1996AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.1996BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.1996CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.1996DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.1996GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.1996IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.1996LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.1996MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.1996NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.1996PT   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.1996SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.199804   M06   Fee paid on   13.05.1998
01.04.200006   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR18.12.2002
IT18.12.2002
GB18.03.2003
DE19.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]FR18.12.2002
GB18.03.2003
DE19.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/22]GB18.03.2003
DE19.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/04]DE19.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/02]DE19.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO9424723  (WIRELESS ACCESS) [PX] 1 * page 24, line 15 - page 25, line 8 * * page 27; figures 1,4A-C,6 *;
 [A]WO9013152  (NOVATEL COMMUNICATIONS) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-3; claims 1-26 *;
 [A]GB2238665  (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA) [A] 1 * abstract *