Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0746449

EP0746449 - VALVE ARRANGEMENT IN COMPRESSED AIR DRIVEN MOTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Atlas Copco Berema Aktiebolag
Box 767
131 24 Nacka / SE
[2000/01]
Former [1996/50]For all designated states
Atlas Copco Berema Aktiebolag
Box 767
S-131 24 Nacka / SE
Inventor(s)01 / HENRIKSSON, Roland
Skogsstigen 24
S-1316 42 Nacka / SE
02 / NILSSON, Ake
Krogtäppan 270
S-136 53 Haninge / SE
[1996/50]
Representative(s)Nilsson, Karl Ingvar , et al
STENHAGEN PATENTBYRA AB P.O. Box 4630
116 91 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1996/50]Nilsson, Karl Ingvar , et al
STENHAGEN PATENTBYRA AB P.O. Box 4630
116 91 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date95911532.028.02.1995
[1996/50]
WO1995SE00208
Priority number, dateSE1994000068428.02.1994         Original published format: SE 9400684
SE1994000068528.02.1994         Original published format: SE 9400685
[1996/50]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9523049
Date:31.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0746449
Date:11.12.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.1995
[1996/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0746449
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE31.08.1995
ClassificationInternational:B25D9/16, F01L25/04
[1996/50]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1996/50]
TitleGerman:VENTILANORDNUNG IN DRUCKLUFTBETRIEBENEN MOTOREN[1996/50]
English:VALVE ARRANGEMENT IN COMPRESSED AIR DRIVEN MOTORS[1996/50]
French:SYSTEME DE SOUPAPES DANS DES MOTEURS A AIR COMPRIME[1996/50]
Entry into regional phase31.08.1995Translation filed 
29.08.1996National basic fee paid 
29.08.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
29.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/50]
04.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.1999Fee for grant paid
25.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.199703   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.1997
Cited inInternational search[X]US4446773  (EMONET HENRI [FR])