blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0737325

EP0737325 - MICRO-ALIGNMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONEYWELL INC.
Honeywell Plaza
Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/42]For all designated states
HONEYWELL INC.
Honeywell Plaza
Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GOETTSCHE, Randy, P.
2128 West Wahalla Lane
Phoenix, AZ 85027 / US
[1996/42]
Representative(s)Herzbach, Dieter, et al
Honeywell Holding AG, Patent- und Lizenzabteilung, Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/42]Herzbach, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Honeywell Holding AG, Patent- und Lizenzabteilung, Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
Application number, filing date95911552.812.12.1994
[1996/42]
WO1994US14336
Priority number, dateUS1993016883116.12.1993         Original published format: US 168831
[1996/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9516932
Date:22.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0737325
Date:16.10.1996
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1996/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0737325
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.06.1995
ClassificationIPC:G02B6/42
[1996/42]
CPC:
G02B6/4226 (EP,US); G02B6/422 (EP,US); G02B6/4239 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/42]
TitleGerman:MIKROAUSRICHTEVORRICHTUNG[1996/42]
English:MICRO-ALIGNMENT METHOD[1996/42]
French:PROCEDE DE MICRO-ALIGNEMENT[1996/42]
Entry into regional phase08.07.1996National basic fee paid 
08.07.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/42]
04.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.1999Fee for grant paid
10.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0050051  (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [X] 1,2,8,9,17,18,23,24 * page 3, line 18 - line 29 * * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 5 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 4,5,16;
 [XA]EP0373225  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 14, line 9 - page 15, line 7 * * page 21, line 37 - page 22, line 18 * * figures 12,22 * [A] 5;
 [A]US5195155  (SHIMAOKA MAKOTO [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 20, line 24 - line 43 ** figure 19 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.