Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0752842

EP0752842 - ARTIFICAL TANNING COMPOSITIONS HAVING IMPROVED STABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): DE
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/03]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TANNER, Paul, Robert
1101 Seapine Court
Maineville, OH 43059 / US
02 / ROBINSON, Larry, Richard
593 Deer Run Trail
Lebanon, OH 45036 / US
[1997/03]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [1997/03]Brooks, Maxim Courtney , et al
Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Application number, filing date95912039.503.03.1995
[1997/03]
WO1995US02641
Priority number, dateUS1994021905329.03.1994         Original published format: US 219053
[1997/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9526178
Date:05.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0752842
Date:15.01.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1995
[1997/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0752842
Date:11.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.10.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/42
[1997/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/03]
TitleGerman:MITTEL ZUR KÜNSTLICHEN BRÄUNUNG MIT VERBESSERTER STABILITÄT[1997/03]
English:ARTIFICAL TANNING COMPOSITIONS HAVING IMPROVED STABILITY[1997/03]
French:COMPOSITIONS A STABILITE AMELIOREE PRODUISANT UN BRONZAGE ARTIFICIEL[1997/03]
Entry into regional phase21.08.1996National basic fee paid 
21.08.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.08.1996Examination requested  [1997/03]
03.11.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.03.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
20.03.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.1998Fee for grant paid
03.06.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.08.1999   
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach
64271 Darmstadt / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1999/39]
Opponent(s)01  09.08.1999   
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach
D-64271 Darmstadt / DE
15.09.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.06.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.01.2001Date of oral proceedings
15.03.2001Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.03.2001Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
16.12.2005Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2006/17]
Appeal following opposition21.05.2001Appeal received No.  T0589/01
13.07.2001Statement of grounds filed
16.12.2005Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
16.12.2005Date of oral proceedings
27.12.2005Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.03.2002
GB03.03.2002
LU03.03.2002
ES04.03.2002
IE04.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
BE31.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
DE31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
DK02.04.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
GR07.10.2002
FR29.11.2002
IT03.03.2005
[2008/06]
Former [2007/34]AT03.03.2002
GB03.03.2002
LU03.03.2002
ES04.03.2002
IE04.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
BE31.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
DK02.04.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
GR07.10.2002
FR29.11.2002
DE01.10.2003
IT03.03.2005
Former [2004/39]AT03.03.2002
GB03.03.2002
LU03.03.2002
ES04.03.2002
IE04.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
BE31.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
DK02.04.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
GR07.10.2002
FR29.11.2002
DE01.10.2003
Former [2004/28]AT03.03.2002
GB03.03.2002
ES04.03.2002
IE04.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
BE31.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
DK02.04.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
GR07.10.2002
FR29.11.2002
DE01.10.2003
Former [2004/23]AT03.03.2002
GB03.03.2002
IE04.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
BE31.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
DK02.04.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
GR07.10.2002
FR29.11.2002
ES10.04.2003
DE01.10.2003
Former [2004/15]AT03.03.2002
GB03.03.2002
IE04.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
BE31.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
DK02.04.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
GR07.10.2002
FR29.11.2002
ES10.04.2003
Former [2003/48]AT03.03.2002
GB03.03.2002
IE04.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
BE31.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
DK02.04.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
GR07.10.2002
FR29.11.2002
Former [2003/47]AT03.03.2002
GB03.03.2002
IE04.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
DK02.04.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
GR07.10.2002
FR29.11.2002
Former [2003/45]AT03.03.2002
GB03.03.2002
IE04.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
DK02.04.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
GR07.10.2002
Former [2003/31]AT03.03.2002
GB03.03.2002
IE04.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
CH31.03.2002
LI31.03.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
GR07.10.2002
Former [2003/21]GB03.03.2002
IE04.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
PT30.09.2002
NL01.10.2002
GR07.10.2002
Former [2003/20]GB03.03.2002
IE04.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
NL01.10.2002
GR07.10.2002
Former [2003/17]GB03.03.2002
IE04.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
NL01.10.2002
Former [2003/08]GB03.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
NL01.10.2002
Former [2003/01]GB03.03.2002
SE04.03.2002
Former [2002/49]SE04.03.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9219214  (RICHARDSON-VICKS) [X] 1-6,8,9 * examples 1-7 *;
 [XP]WO9412146  (ESTEE LAUDER) [XP] 1-6,8,9 * page 13; example 1 *;
 [XP]EP0622070  (MERCK PATENT) [XP] 1-6,8,9 * column W *
 [A]  - S.T.N., File Supplier, KARLSRUHE,DE, [A] 1 * File Chemical Abstracts, vol 120, n 173108 , see the abstract & JP-A-05320031 (KAO CORP.) *