Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0752842 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0752842



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 662
13.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
06.03.2006 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
20.02.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 37
27.12.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
16.12.2005 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 1
24.11.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.11.2005 Claims Appeal 3
17.11.2005 Claims Appeal 3
17.11.2005 Claims Appeal 2
17.11.2005 Claims Appeal 3
17.11.2005 Claims Appeal 1
17.11.2005 Claims Appeal 3
17.11.2005 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
17.11.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
16.11.2005 Claims Appeal 2
16.11.2005 Claims Appeal 3
16.11.2005 Claims Appeal 3
16.11.2005 Claims Appeal 3
16.11.2005 Claims Appeal 1
16.11.2005 Claims Appeal 3
16.11.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
16.11.2005 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Appeal 1
13.09.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.07.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.07.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.07.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.07.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.06.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
23.08.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.08.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
13.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 19
13.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 28
13.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 7
13.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 3
04.02.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.01.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
26.11.2001 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
21.11.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.07.2001 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.07.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
11.06.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.06.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
07.06.2001 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
23.05.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.05.2001 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
21.05.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
26.03.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.03.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.03.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.03.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.03.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
15.03.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
15.03.2001 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 3
15.03.2001 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
15.03.2001 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 3
15.03.2001 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.01.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.01.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.01.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
05.01.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.01.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.12.2000 Claims Opposition 3
28.12.2000 Claims Opposition 3
28.12.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.12.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
22.12.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
20.12.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
20.12.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
14.12.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.10.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.10.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
19.10.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.10.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.10.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.10.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
12.10.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
12.10.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
19.09.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2000 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.06.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.06.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
31.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.05.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.05.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.05.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
30.03.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
30.03.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 2
22.03.2000 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
22.03.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.03.2000 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
22.03.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
10.03.2000 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
10.03.2000 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
10.03.2000 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
08.03.2000 Document concerning representation Opposition 4
14.01.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.01.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.01.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.01.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.09.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
15.09.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
18.08.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
10.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.08.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.08.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
10.08.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
10.08.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
10.08.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
10.08.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
09.08.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
01.10.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.06.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.06.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
03.06.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.03.1998 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
02.03.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
02.03.1998 Description Search / examination 20
02.03.1998 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.11.1997 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
03.11.1997 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
26.09.1997 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
04.12.1996 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.08.1996 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.03.1996 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
20.03.1996 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
17.11.1995 Priority document Search / examination 33
03.11.1995 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
05.10.1995 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
05.10.1995 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 30
05.10.1995 Priority document Search / examination 32