EP0749438 - NOVEL SILYL COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Byk Gulden Lomberg Chemische Fabrik GmbH Byk-Gulden-Str. 2 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2000/50] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states Byk Gulden Lomberg Chemische Fabrik GmbH Byk-Gulden-Str. 2 D-78467 Konstanz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMSCHLER, Hermann Hohenhewenstrasse 19 D-78315 Radolfzell / DE | 02 /
FLOCKERZI, Dieter Ackerweg 26 D-78476 Allensbach / DE | 03 /
GUTTERER, Beate Allensbacher Strasse 6b D-78476 Allensbach / DE | [1996/52] | Application number, filing date | 95912217.7 | 07.03.1995 | [1996/52] | WO1995EP00836 | Priority number, date | CH19940000701 | 09.03.1994 Original published format: CH 70194 | [1996/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9524416 | Date: | 14.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0749438 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0749438 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07J71/00, A61K31/58 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
C07J71/0031 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/52] | Extension states | LT | 05.09.1996 | SI | 05.09.1996 | Title | German: | NEUE SILYLVERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [1996/52] | English: | NOVEL SILYL COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE | [1996/52] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSES SILYLE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [1996/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 29.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 02.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/49] | Request for further processing for: | 01.08.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 01.08.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2000 | Decision despatched | 18.11.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 18.11.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 02.02.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | ES543211 [ ] (FARMHISPANIA S. A.); | [A]US3996359 (BRATTSAND RALPH LENNART, et al) [A] 1,6 * column W *; | [A]WO9211280 (INST FARMACEUTYCZNY [PL]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document * | [A] - L. CASTELLET ET AL, "Process for the preparation of budesonide.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870302), vol. 106, no. 9, Database accession no. 67573q, page 641, column 1 [A] 1,6 * abstract * |