Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0764346

EP0764346 - HIGH VERTICAL ASPECT RATIO THIN FILM STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.04.2006  [2006/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
21st floor
300 Lakeside Drive
Oakland, CA 94612-3350 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/13]For all designated states
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
21st floor, 300 Lakeside Drive
Oakland, CA 94612-3550 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KELLER, Christopher, G.
Apartment 7B, 1059 Monroe Avenue
Albany, CA 94706 / US
02 / FERRARI, Mauro
2815 Eccleston
Walnut Creek, CA 94596 / US
[1997/13]
Representative(s)Lunt, Mark George Francis
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/13]Lunt, Mark George Francis
Dibb Lupton Alsop Fountain Precinct Balm Green
Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB
Application number, filing date95912823.207.03.1995
[1997/13]
WO1995US02935
Priority number, dateUS1994020745907.03.1994         Original published format: US 207459
[1997/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9524736
Date:14.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0764346
Date:26.03.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.1995
[1997/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.09.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/64, H01L27/108
[1997/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1997/13]
TitleGerman:DÜNNSCHICHTSTRUKTUREN HOHEN VERTIKALASPEKTVERHÄLTNISSES[1997/13]
English:HIGH VERTICAL ASPECT RATIO THIN FILM STRUCTURES[1997/13]
French:STRUCTURES A COUCHES MINCES PRESENTANT UNE HAUTEUR ELEVEE[1997/13]
Entry into regional phase18.09.1996National basic fee paid 
18.09.1996Search fee paid 
18.09.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.09.1996Examination requested  [1997/13]
25.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
02.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/15]
08.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200511   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0417924  (UNIV WAYNE STATE [US]) [X] 1,9,13,22-25 * figure 2 *;
 [X]US4705659  (BERNSTEIN JONATHAN J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,11,13,14,22-25 * figures 6,7 *;
 [X]US4740410  (MULLER RICHARD S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11,13,14,23-25 * figures 13-17 *;
 [X]US4661212  (EHRFELD WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 23-28 * column A *;
 [X]US5024369  (FROES FRANCIS H [US], et al) [X] 23-28 * column A *;
 [E]US5580827  (AKAMINE SHINYA [US]) [E] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]JPH03218998  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR) [X] 1
International search[X]US5126810  (GOTOU HIROSHI [JP]);
 [X]JPH01138110  (SHOWA DENKO KK);
 [X]US4307507  (GRAY HENRY F, et al)