blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0752010

EP0752010 - USE OF ALKYLENE DIAMINE TETRAPROPIONIC ACIDS FOR THE OILING OFF OF LEATHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.1999
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2000Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
[1997/02]
Inventor(s)01 / ZAUNS-HUBER, Rudolf
Einsteinstrasse 7
D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / WOLTER, Fredi
Am Klingelsberg 22
D-41189 Mönchengladbach / DE
03 / UPHUES, Günter
Robert-Koch-Strasse 45
D-40789 Monheim / DE
04 / PRINZ, Wolfgang
Krischerstrasse 79
D-40789 Monheim / DE
05 / SCHENKER, Gilbert
Wilbecker Strasse 118
D-40699 Erkrath / DE
[1997/02]
Application number, filing date95913109.514.03.1995
[1997/02]
WO1995EP00946
Priority number, dateDE1994440992623.03.1994         Original published format: DE 4409926
[1997/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9525816
Date:28.09.1995
Language:DE
[1995/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0752010
Date:08.01.1997
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0752010
Date:14.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.09.1995
ClassificationIPC:C14C9/00
[1997/02]
CPC:
C07C229/16 (EP); C14C9/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   LI [1997/02]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON ALKYLENDIAMINTETRAPROPIONSÄUREN ZUR FETTENDEN AUSRÜSTUNG VON LEDER[1997/02]
English:USE OF ALKYLENE DIAMINE TETRAPROPIONIC ACIDS FOR THE OILING OFF OF LEATHERS[1997/02]
French:UTILISATION D'ACIDES ALKYLENE-DIAMINOTETRAPROPIONIQUES POUR METTRE DES CUIRS EN HUILE[1997/02]
Entry into regional phase16.09.1996National basic fee paid 
16.09.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.09.1996Examination requested  [1997/02]
19.11.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.03.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.1998Fee for grant paid
10.06.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.07.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB14.03.1999
CH31.03.1999
LI31.03.1999
[2001/05]
Former [2000/52]CH31.03.1999
LI31.03.1999
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS4812473  ;
 [A]GB1048321  (JULIUS STOCKHAUSEN) [A] 1 * claims 1,2,4 *;
 [A]EP0184741  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 73, no. 17, Database accession no. 73-24035U, & JPS4812473 A 00000000 (KANEGAFUCHI SPINNING) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.