Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0753082

EP0753082 - PCVD PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR COATING DOMED SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2000
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For:AT  CH  DE  ES  LI  SE 
Schott Glas
Hattenbergstrasse 10
55122 Mainz / DE
For:GB 
Carl Zeiss Stiftung Trading as Schott Glaswerke
Hattenbergstrasse 10
55122 Mainz / DE
[1999/27]
Former [1998/20]For:AT  CH  DE  ES  LI  SE 
Schott Glas
Hattenbergstrasse 10
55122 Mainz / DE
For:GB 
Carl Zeiss Stiftung Trading as Schott Glaswerke
Hattenbergstrasse 10
D-55122 Mainz / DE
Former [1997/03]For:AT  CH  DE  ES  LI  SE 
Schott Glaswerke
Hattenbergstrasse 10
55122 Mainz / DE
For:GB 
Carl Zeiss Stiftung Trading as Schott Glaswerke
Hattenbergstrasse 10
D-55122 Mainz / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HEMING, Martin
Pfarrberg 7
D-55442 Stromberg / DE
02 / LANGE, Ulrich
Im Rheinblick 12
D-55411 Bingen / DE
03 / LANGFELD, Roland
Fuchstanzstrasse 80
D-60489 Frankfurt / DE
04 / MÖHL, Wolfgang
Bachusstrasse 8
D-67550 Worms / DE
05 / OTTO, Jürgen
Draiser Strasse 110
D-55128 Mainz / DE
06 / PAQUET, Volker
Sertoriusring 187
D-55126 Mainz / DE
07 / SEGNER, Johannes
Alte Steige 7
D-55442 Stromberg / DE
08 / WALTHER, Marten
Dr.-Fritz-Bockius-Strasse 21
D-55270 Bubenheim / DE
[1997/03]
Representative(s)Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Fuchs
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [1997/03]Fuchs, Luderschmidt & Partner
Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date95914322.329.03.1995
[1997/03]
WO1995EP01168
Priority number, dateDE1994441084129.03.1994         Original published format: DE 4410841
[1997/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9526427
Date:05.10.1995
Language:DE
[1995/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0753082
Date:15.01.1997
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1995
[1997/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0753082
Date:07.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.10.1995
ClassificationInternational:C23C16/52, C23C16/50, C23C16/44
[1997/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   LI,   SE [1997/03]
TitleGerman:PCVD-VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON GEWÖLBTEN SUBSTRATEN[1997/03]
English:PCVD PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR COATING DOMED SUBSTRATES[1997/03]
French:PROCEDE PLASMA-CVD DE REVETEMENT DE SUBSTRATS BOMBES[1997/03]
Entry into regional phase13.09.1996National basic fee paid 
13.09.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.04.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.09.1996Examination requested  [1997/03]
18.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.12.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.1999Fee for grant paid
13.03.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.04.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]JPH04293235  ;
 [A]US4500563  (ELLENBERGER CHARLES E ET AL) [A] 1-25 * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US4935661  (HEINECKE RUDOLF A ET AL) [A] 1-25 * column 7, line 7 - line 28 *;
 [A]DE8313563U  (H. LINN) [A] 1-25 * page 19, line 19 - page 20, line 5 *;
 [A]US5272360  (TODOROKI SATORU ET AL) [A] 1-25 * figure 5 *;
 [A]DE3322680  (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-25 * page 10, line 1 - line 3 *;
 [A]DE4137606  (SCHOTT GLASWERKE) [A] 1-25 * example 1 *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930308), vol. 017, no. 110, Database accession no. (E - 1329), & JP04293235 A 19921016 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 13 * abstract * [A] 1-12,14-25