Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0717722 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0717722



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 392
14.11.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.09.1999 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 1
10.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
10.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
29.06.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
18.02.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.01.1999 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
29.10.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
29.10.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 62
12.10.1998 Request for assignment Search / examination 3
28.09.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
12.02.1998 Claims Search / examination 5
12.02.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.12.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.11.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.08.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.07.1996 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
12.07.1996 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
02.07.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.07.1996 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 7
07.03.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.03.1996 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
27.02.1996 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
21.12.1995 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
21.11.1995 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.11.1995 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 58
21.11.1995 Priority document Search / examination 76
21.11.1995 Priority document Search / examination 70
21.11.1995 Priority document Search / examination 62