Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0717722


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.06.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2007  [2007/29]
26.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.02.2004  [2004/07]
14.03.2003 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  02.05.2003  [2003/18]
07.03.2003 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  23.04.2003  [2003/17]
26.10.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2001 [2001/50]
27.04.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2001 [2001/24]
12.01.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2001 [2001/09]
10.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.12.2000 [2000/52]
26.11.1999 (Expected) grant published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
22.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.06.1999 Change - German title published on  11.08.1999 [1999/32]
24.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
24.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
03.03.1999 Renewal fee
22.01.1999 Change - applicant published on  10.03.1999 [1999/10]
22.01.1999 Change - representative published on  10.03.1999 [1999/10]
27.10.1998 Communication of intention to grant
04.03.1998 Renewal fee
17.02.1998 Examination report or reply
27.11.1997 Examination report or reply
01.08.1997 First examination report
31.07.1997 Examination report or reply
05.03.1997 Renewal fee
05.07.1996 Supplementary search report published on  21.08.1996 [1996/34]
21.06.1996 Change - classification published on  07.08.1996 [1996/32]
21.06.1996 Change - classification published on  07.08.1996 [1996/32]
10.05.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.06.1996 [1996/26]
10.05.1996 Request for examination filed published on  26.06.1996 [1996/26]
17.04.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
16.03.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
29.02.1996 PCT data prior to European publication