Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0717722

EP0717722 - CRYSTALLINE HYDRATED LAYERED SODIUM AND POTASSIUM SILICATES AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PQ Holding, Inc.
103 Springer Building 3411 Silverside Road
Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]For all designated states
PQ Holding, Inc.
103 Springer Building, 3411 Silverside Road
Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US
Former [1996/26]For all designated states
PQ Corporation
Valley Forge Executive Mall P.O. Box 840
Valley Forge, PA 19482 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VON REHREN BORGSTEDT, Eric
124 Locust Lane
Wallingford PA 19086 / US
02 / DENKEWICZ, Raymond, P., Jr.
222 Larchwood Drive
Warwick RI 02886 / US
[1996/26]
Representative(s)Weisert, Annekäte , et al
Patentanwälte Kraus & Weisert Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [1996/26]Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date95914730.715.03.1995
[1996/26]
WO1995US03274
Priority number, dateUS1994025846610.06.1994         Original published format: US 258466
US1994027048905.07.1994         Original published format: US 270489
US1994033426903.11.1994         Original published format: US 334269
[1996/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9534506
Date:21.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/54]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0717722
Date:26.06.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.1995
[1996/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0717722
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:C01B33/38, C11D3/12
[1996/32]
Former International [1996/26]C01B33/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/26]
TitleGerman:KRISTALLINE, HYDRATISIERTE NATRIUM- UND KALIUMSCHICHTSILIKATE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[1999/32]
English:CRYSTALLINE HYDRATED LAYERED SODIUM AND POTASSIUM SILICATES AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SAME[1996/26]
French:SILICATES DE SODIUM ET DE POTASSIUM CRISTALLINS, HYDRATES ET FORMANT DES COUCHES, PROCEDE POUR LES PRODUIRE[1996/26]
Former [1996/26]KRISTALLINES NATRIUMSCHICHTSILIKAT UND KALIUMSILIKATE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG
Entry into regional phase07.03.1996National basic fee paid 
07.03.1996Search fee paid 
07.03.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/26]
04.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
18.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
29.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1999Fee for grant paid
10.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR12.01.2000
IE15.03.2000
LU15.03.2000
PT12.04.2000
MC30.09.2000
[2007/29]
Former [2004/07]GR12.01.2000
IE15.03.2000
PT12.04.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/18]IE15.03.2000
PT12.04.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/17]IE15.03.2000
MC31.03.2000
PT12.04.2000
Former [2001/50]IE15.03.2000
PT12.04.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2001/24]PT12.04.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2001/09]PT12.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0578986  (HOECHST AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US5236682  ;
 [Y]US5268156