blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0763235


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.07.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  12.09.2001 [2001/37]
18.05.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2001 [2001/27]
11.08.2000 (Expected) grant published on  27.09.2000 [2000/39]
20.06.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.03.2000 Communication of intention to grant
06.03.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.03.2000 Change - request for further processing
02.03.2000 Change - request for further processing
29.02.2000 Renewal fee
28.02.2000 Change - request for further processing
11.02.2000 Application refused
03.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant
20.08.1999 Examination report or reply
28.07.1999 Examination report or reply
19.05.1999 Examination report or reply
23.02.1999 Renewal fee
15.01.1999 First examination report
08.01.1999 Examination report or reply
25.02.1998 Renewal fee
28.03.1997 Amendment by applicant
21.02.1997 Renewal fee
31.01.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.03.1997 [1997/12]
31.01.1997 Request for examination filed published on  19.03.1997 [1997/12]
16.01.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
17.10.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
29.02.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
22.12.1995 PCT data prior to European publication