Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0763235

EP0763235 - CONTROL SYSTEM UTILIZING AN ADAPTIVE PREDICTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2001
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.09.2001 [2001/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
POLAROID CORPORATION
549 Technology Square Cambridge
Massachusetts 02139-3589 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/12]For all designated states
POLAROID CORPORATION
549 Technology Square
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139-3589 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SULLIVAN, Paul, F.
139 Green Hill Road
Westwood, MA 02090 / US
[1997/12]
Representative(s)Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/12]Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky
Tal 13
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date95915531.831.03.1995
[1997/12]
WO1995US04140
Priority number, dateUS1994022118931.03.1994         Original published format: US 221189
[1997/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9527282
Date:12.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0763235
Date:19.03.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.1995
[1997/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0763235
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.10.1995
ClassificationInternational:G11B5/596, G11B7/095, G11B21/10, G11B21/08
[1997/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   SE [1997/12]
TitleGerman:STEUERUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINEM ADAPTIVEN PREDICTOR[1997/12]
English:CONTROL SYSTEM UTILIZING AN ADAPTIVE PREDICTOR[1997/12]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMANDE A PREDICTEUR ADAPTATIF[1997/12]
Entry into regional phase30.09.1996National basic fee paid 
30.09.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.09.1996Examination requested  [1997/12]
03.02.1997Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
13.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.02.2000Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
09.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2000Fee for grant paid
08.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/37]
Request for further processing for:22.02.2000Request for further processing filed
22.02.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.03.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE27.12.2000
[2001/27]
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4616276  (WORKMAN MICHAEL L [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * column 3, line 56 - column 8, line 61; figures 1-5 * [Y] 4-8,14-16;
 [Y]US4860271  (YOKOGAWA FUMIHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 4-7,14,15 * column 3, line 17 - column 6, line 55; figures 1-11 *;
 [YA]GB2187878  (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 8,16 * page 2, line 120 - page 7, line 10; figures 1-15 * [A] 1,4-7,9,14,15;
 [A]WO9306595  (INTEGRAL PERIPHERALS INC [US]) [A] 1,7,9,11,12 * page 8, line 13 - page 24, line 3; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US5121374  (BARTON MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1,4,7,9,14 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 44; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]EP0322841  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,7,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0392777  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7,9 * page 7, column 12, line 52 - page 13, column 23, line 37; figures 1-30 *;
 [AD]EP0094313  (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [AD] 1,7,9 * the whole document *