EP0757987 - Pyrazole-carboxylic acid derivatives as plant disease control agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/07] | PYRAZOLECARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVE AND PLANT DISEASE CONTROL AGENT | ||
[1997/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 7-1, Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 7-1, Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKIYAMA, Shigeaki Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. Central Research Institute 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi Chiba-ken 274 / JP | 02 /
TAKEYAMA, Toshiaki Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd Central Research Institute 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funnabashi-shi Chiba-ken 274 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Junichi Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. Central Research Institute 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi Chiba-ken 274 / JP | 04 /
NAKAJIMA, Yasuyuki Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd Central Research Institute 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funnabashi-shi Chiba-ken 274 / JP | 05 /
SUZUKI, Hiroyuki Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. Central Research Institute 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi Chiba-ken 274 / JP | 06 /
YASUMI, Yoshiaki Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. Central Research Institute 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi Chiba-ken 274 / JP | 07 /
KIKUCHI, Takamasa Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. Central Research Institute 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi Chiba-ken 274 / JP | 08 /
OHYA, Hiroshi Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1470, Ohaza Shiraoka Shiraoka-cho, Minamisa / JP | 09 /
SASABE, Shigeru Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1470, Ohaza Shiraoka Shiraoka-cho, Minamisa / JP | 10 /
NISHIOKA, Masanori Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd 1470, Ohaza Shiraoka Shiraoka-cho, Minamisa / JP | 11 /
FURUSATO, Takashi Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1470, Ohaza Shiraoka Shiraoka-cho, Minamisa / JP | [1997/07] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95916043.3 | 25.04.1995 | [1997/07] | WO1995JP00808 | Priority number, date | JP19940089903 | 27.04.1994 Original published format: JP 8990394 | JP19950091058 | 17.04.1995 Original published format: JP 9105895 | [1997/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9529161 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0757987 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0757987 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.11.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/14, A01N43/56, A01N43/78, C07D405/12, C07D401/12, C07D409/12, // (C07D405/12, 303:00, 231:00),(C07D401/12, 231:00, 213:00) | [1997/15] | CPC: |
C07D277/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07D231/14 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,KR,US);
A01N47/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/07] | C07D231/14, A01N43/56, A01N43/78, // C07D277/56 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/07] | Title | German: | Pyrazol-Carbonsäurederivate als Mittel zur Bekämpfung von Pflanzenkrankheiten | [1999/37] | English: | Pyrazole-carboxylic acid derivatives as plant disease control agents | [1999/37] | French: | Dérivés de l'acide pyrazole-carboxylique comme agents de lutte contre les maladies végétales | [1999/37] |
Former [1997/07] | PYRAZOLCARBONSÄUREDERIVAT UND EIN MITTEL ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON PFLANZENKRANKHEITEN | ||
Former [1997/07] | PYRAZOLECARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVE AND PLANT DISEASE CONTROL AGENT | ||
Former [1997/07] | DERIVE DE L'ACIDE PYRAZOLECARBOXYLIQUE ET AGENT DE LUTTE CONTRE LES MALADIES VEGETALES | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1996 | Translation filed | 19.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 19.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0253776 ; | [X]JPH0256467 ; | [X]JPH01290662 ; | [X]JPH01168675 ; | [XD]JPH02292263 ; | [A]JPH0393774 ; | [A]JPH02300173 ; | [X]US3700657 (NORDIN IVAN C) [X] 7 * column 5, line 10 *; | [X]FR2337997 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU]) [X] 7 * page 17; example 4 *; | [Y]EP0005204 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1,7 * abstract *; | [X]GB2020662 (MONSANTO CO) [X] 1 * page 3; table 1 *; | [X]EP0087780 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 7 * Reference examples 19,20 *; | [A]EP0276177 (SUMITOMO CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1,7 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0279239 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1,7 * page 9, line 43 - page 10, line 23 *; | [Y]EP0333131 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1,7 * page 5 *; | [A]EP0394043 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,7 * claims 1,6 *; | [X]EP0463756 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [X] 7 * examples 1,2,42,50 *; | [X]EP0514217 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [X] 7 * intermediates 8,9,10 *; | [X]EP0571326 (SANDOZ LTD [CH], et al) [X] 7 * example 7A *; | [E]WO9529162 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0707000 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19741111), vol. 81, no. 19, Database accession no. 115750j, XP002025055 [X] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - M.F.A. ABDEL-LATEEF ET AL., ACTA PHYTOPATHOL., (1973), vol. 8(3-4), pages 269 - 282 [ ] * Chem. Abs. Registry Nos: 22900-83-0;7210-77-7 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 14, Database accession no. 90-103192, XP002025057 & JPH0253776 A 19900222 (MITSUBISHI KASEI CORP.) [X] 7 * Chem. Abs. 113:78385; Registry Nos: 128537-25-7;88398-74-7 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 14, Database accession no. 90-104554, XP002025058 & JPH0256467 A 19900226 (SUMITOMO CHEM. IND. KK.) [X] 7 * Chem. Abs. 113:54322; Registry No: 50920-65-5 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 02, Database accession no. 90-011050, XP002025059 & JPH01290662 A 19891122 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM. INC.) [X] 7 * Chem. Abs. 112:198375; Registry No: 26308-43-0 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 32, Database accession no. 89-232311, XP002025060 & JPH01168675 A 19890704 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM. INC.) [X] 7 * Chem. Abs. 112:35854; Registry No: 50920-64-4 * | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19950213), vol. 122, no. 7, Database accession no. 74533, XP002025056 [XP] 7 * Chem. Abs. Registry No: 26308-42-9 * | [ ] - I. OKADA ET AL., NIPPON NOYAKU GAKKAISHI, (1994), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 317 - 320 | [XD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 03, Database accession no. 91-019178, XP002025061 & JPH02292263 A 19901203 (MITSUBISHI KASEI CORP.) [XD] 1,7 * page 584 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 134, Database accession no. (C - 848), & JP03093774 A 19910418 (NIPPON NOHYAKU CO., LTD.) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 79, Database accession no. (C - 809), & JP02300173 A 19901212 (NIPPON NOHYAKU CO., LTD.) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS54143521 (BAYER AG); | [Y]JPS62120369 (BAYER AG); | [Y]JPS63201178 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [Y]JPS6425763 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [Y]JPH01283274 (HOECHST AG); | [Y]JPH02300173 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0393774 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD); | [Y]JPH03120255 (BASF AG) |