Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0755340

EP0755340 - MASS-BODY DRIVE FOR A ROTARY TIGHTENING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  24.05.2002
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2002Opposition withdrawnpublished on 10.07.2002  [2002/28]
24.05.2002Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect publishedpublished on 10.07.2002  [2002/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Autoliv Development AB
Wallentinsvägen 22
447 83 Vårgårda / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
AUTOLIV DEVELOPMENT AKTIEBOLAG
447 83 Vargarda / SE
Former [1997/05]For all designated states
AUTOLIV DEVELOPMENT AKTIEBOLAG
S-447 83 Vargarda / SE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIDT, Thomas
Klodstrasse 2
D-23663 Timmendorfer Strand / DE
02 / BUTENOP, Klaus
Obendeich 29
D-25379 Herzhorn / DE
03 / KRÖGER, Doris
Von-Helms-Strasse 23
D-25436 Tornesch / DE
04 / BARCKMANN, Jörg
Ohlendamp 2
D-25436 Tornesch-Ahrenlohe / DE
05 / RODE, René
Weidenbaumweg 5
D-21029 Hamburg / DE
[1997/05]
Representative(s)Müller, Karl-Ernst , et al
Patentanwälte
Becker & Müller
Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/05]Müller, Karl-Ernst, Dr., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
Application number, filing date95916088.811.04.1995
[1997/05]
WO1995SE00388
Priority number, dateDE1994441215011.04.1994         Original published format: DE 4412150
DE1994442245030.06.1994         Original published format: DE 4422450
DE199510314301.02.1995         Original published format: DE 19503143
[1997/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9527638
Date:19.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0755340
Date:29.01.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1995
[1997/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0755340
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE19.10.1995
ClassificationInternational:B60R22/46
[1997/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [1997/05]
TitleGerman:MASSENKÖRPERANTRIEB FÜR EINE ROTATIONSSTRAFFERVORRICHTUNG[1997/05]
English:MASS-BODY DRIVE FOR A ROTARY TIGHTENING DEVICE[1997/05]
French:ENTRAINEMENT A MASSELOTTES DESTINE A UN DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE ROTATIF[1997/05]
Entry into regional phase09.10.1996National basic fee paid 
09.10.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
09.10.1996Examination requested  [1997/05]
23.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.1999Fee for grant paid
12.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.10.2000  11.01.2002  WITHDRAWN
Edward Tomlinson
Riemerlingerstrasse 7a
85662 Hohenbrunn / DE
Opponent's representative
Frohwitter, Bernhard
Frohwitter
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2002/28]
Opponent(s)01  09.10.2000  11.01.2002  WITHDRAWN
Edward Tomlinson
Riemerlingerstrasse 7a
85662 Hohenbrunn / DE
Opponent's representative
Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
Former [2001/15]
Opponent(s)01  09.10.2000  25.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Edward Tomlinson
Riemerlingerstrasse 7a
85662 Hohenbrunn / DE
Opponent's representative
Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
Former [2000/50]
Opponent(s)01  09.10.2000  25.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Tomlinson, Edward James
Marienwerderstr. 2
81929 München / DE
24.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.05.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.02.2002Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
14.02.2002Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2002/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2618119  ;
 [A]DE2814487  ;
 [A]DE2931164  (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG);
 [A]DE3220498  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE])