blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0703730 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0703730



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 145
16.10.2002 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.11.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.08.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
22.08.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
22.08.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.08.2001 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
22.08.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 4
15.06.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
26.05.2001 Description Search / examination 2
26.05.2001 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
23.05.2001 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 6
04.04.2001 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
27.03.2001 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
26.03.2001 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
15.11.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
15.11.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
17.10.2000 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
03.07.2000 Description Search / examination 7
03.07.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.06.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
21.02.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.01.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
10.01.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.01.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.11.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.11.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.11.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.08.1999 Request for assignment Search / examination 1
24.06.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
27.05.1999 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
03.05.1999 Request for assignment Search / examination 2
15.12.1995 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.11.1995 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
26.10.1995 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
26.10.1995 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 24
26.10.1995 Priority document Search / examination 18