blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0703730


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
06.06.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.07.2003  [2003/30]
30.05.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.07.2003  [2003/29]
02.05.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.06.2003  [2003/25]
11.01.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2003  [2003/09]
27.12.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.02.2003  [2003/06]
15.11.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.01.2003  [2003/01]
18.10.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2002  [2002/49]
18.10.2002 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.12.2002  [2002/49]
11.10.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2002  [2002/48]
26.10.2001 (Expected) grant published on  12.12.2001 [2001/50]
31.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.06.2001 Communication of intention to grant
11.06.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.06.2001 Communication of intention to grant
11.04.2001 Renewal fee
10.11.2000 Communication of intention to grant
06.07.2000 Examination report or reply
11.04.2000 Renewal fee
16.02.2000 Examination report or reply
14.01.2000 Examination report or reply
04.11.1999 Examination report or reply
25.06.1999 First examination report
21.06.1999 Examination report or reply
21.05.1999 Change - applicant published on  07.07.1999 [1999/27]
16.04.1999 Renewal fee
06.04.1998 Renewal fee
04.03.1997 Renewal fee
10.05.1996 Request for examination filed published on  26.06.1996 [1996/26]
16.02.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.04.1996 [1996/14]
29.01.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
09.01.1996 PCT data prior to European publication