Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0703730
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3751634BGlobal Dossier 01.03.2006B2
JPH08512359 24.12.1996A
Priority number Date
EP9501461 18.04.1995
EP94201067 18.04.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0703730Global Dossier 12.12.2001B1
EP0703730 03.04.1996A1
Priority number Date
EP9501461 18.04.1995
EP94201067 18.04.1994
EP95916672 18.04.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT210386T 15.12.2001T
Priority number Date
EP9501461 18.04.1995
EP94201067 18.04.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2308395 10.11.1995A
Priority number Date
EP9501461 18.04.1995
EP94201067 18.04.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2165157 12.06.2007C
CA2165157 26.10.1995A1
Priority number Date
EP9501461 18.04.1995
EP94201067 18.04.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69524517D 24.01.2002D1
Priority number Date
EP9501461 18.04.1995
EP94201067 18.04.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0703730T 02.04.2002T3
Priority number Date
EP9501461 18.04.1995
EP94201067 18.04.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
FI955962 13.12.1995A
Priority number Date
EP9501461 18.04.1995
EP94201067 18.04.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR967002733 23.05.1996A
Priority number Date
EP9501461 18.04.1995
EP94201067 18.04.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO313312B 16.09.2002B1
NO955118L 15.12.1995L
NO955118D 15.12.1995D0
Priority number Date
EP9501461 18.04.1995
EP94201067 18.04.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL177022B 30.09.1999B1
PL312245 01.04.1996A1
Priority number Date
EP9501461 18.04.1995
EP94201067 18.04.1994
EP95916672 18.04.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6013255 11.01.2000A
Priority number Date
US56410196 08.04.1996
EP94201067 18.04.1994
US97854397 26.11.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9528092Global Dossier 26.10.1995A1
Priority number Date
EP94201067 18.04.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1126942 17.07.1996A
Priority number Date
EP94201067 18.04.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2169129T 01.07.2002T3
Priority number Date
EP94201067 18.04.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW305768B 21.05.1997B
Priority number Date
EP94201067 18.04.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA9503120 11.01.1996B
Priority number Date
EP94201067 18.04.1994