Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0703730

EP0703730 - STABLE WATER-IN-OIL EMULSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 23.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[N/P]
Former [1999/27]For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Former [1996/14]For all designated states
GIST-BROCADES B.V.
Wateringseweg 1, P.O. Box 1
NL-2600 MA Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / EDENS, Luppo
Hoflaan 118
NL-3062 JL Rotterdam / NL
02 / MEIJER, Dirk
Kerkhofweg 79
NL-4835 GB Breda / NL
03 / VAN PARIDON, Petrus Andreas
Eemwijkstraat 23
NL-2271 RD Voorburg / NL
[1996/14]
Representative(s)Visser-Luirink, Gesina , et al
DSM Patents & Trademarks
Office Delft
P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
[N/P]
Former [1996/14]Visser-Luirink, Gesina, Dr. , et al
c/o GIST-BROCADES N.V., Patents and Trademarks Dept., Wateringseweg 1, P.O. Box 1
NL-2600 MA Delft / NL
Application number, filing date95916672.918.04.1995
[1996/14]
WO1995EP01461
Priority number, dateEP1994020106718.04.1994         Original published format: EP 94201067
[1996/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9528092
Date:26.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0703730
Date:03.04.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.1995
[1996/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0703730
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.10.1995
ClassificationInternational:A23K1/16, A23K1/18, A23L1/035, A61K7/00, C11B3/00
[1996/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/14]
TitleGerman:STABILE WASSER-IN-OEL EMULSIONEN[1996/14]
English:STABLE WATER-IN-OIL EMULSIONS[1996/14]
French:EMULSIONS HUILE DANS EAU STABLES[1996/14]
Entry into regional phase18.01.1996National basic fee paid 
18.01.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
26.04.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/26]
24.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
01.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
15.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2001Fee for grant paid
22.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
06.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.12.2001
BE12.12.2001
CH12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
LI12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
DE13.03.2002
IE18.04.2002
LU18.04.2002
MC18.04.2002
[2004/39]
Former [2003/30]AT12.12.2001
BE12.12.2001
CH12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
LI12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
DE13.03.2002
IE18.04.2002
MC18.04.2002
Former [2003/29]AT12.12.2001
BE12.12.2001
CH12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
LI12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
IE18.04.2002
MC18.04.2002
Former [2003/25]AT12.12.2001
BE12.12.2001
CH12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
LI12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
MC18.04.2002
Former [2003/09]AT12.12.2001
BE12.12.2001
CH12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
LI12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
Former [2003/06]BE12.12.2001
CH12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
LI12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
Former [2003/01]CH12.12.2001
GR12.12.2001
LI12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
Former [2002/49]GR12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
Former [2002/48]PT12.03.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]SU562281  ;
 [X]US3966632  (JOHN A. COLLIOPOULOS ET AL.) [X] 1-4,6,8-12 * column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 8 * * example 3 *;
 [X]US3958033  (REX J. SIMS ET AL.) [X] 1-9,11,12 * column 6, line 33 - line 35 * * claims 1-4,6 *;
 [Y]EP0247552  (SO.RI.FAR.) [Y] 1-9,11,12 * column 1, line 1 - line 17 * * claims 1,7,8 *;
 [DY]WO9206599  (UNILEVER) [DY] 1-9,11,12 * page 5, line 23 - line 29 * * page 6, line 5 - line 6 * * claims 1-9 *;
 [A]JPH0586368  ;
 [A]EP0174377  (MEIJI MILK PRODUCTS COMPANY) [A] 1-4,6,8,11,12 * page 2, line 11 - page 8, line 9 * * example 8 * * claims 1,5,6 *;
 [A]US4869919  (ARTHUR N. LOWERY) [A] 1-4,6,8,11,12 * column 3, line 15 - line 54 * * claims 1-6,8,9 *;
 [A]EP0354356  (COOPERLAT SOC. COOP. A.R.L.) [A] 1-4,11,12 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 5 *;
 [A]JPS5645405  ;
 [A]JPS6463032  ;
 [DA]WO9316175  (GIST-BROCADES) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9314645  (GIST-BROCADES) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 78, no. 21, Database accession no. 78-37849A, & SU562281 A 19770912 (MOSCOW SVOBODA COSMETIC) [X] 1-12 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 18, Database accession no. 93-149429, & JPH0586368 A 19930406 (MARINO FORUM 21 SH) [A] 1,6,8 * abstract *
 [A]  - A. LILLEHAUG, "Oral immunization of rainbow trout, Salmo gairdneri Richardson, against vibriosis with vaccines protected against digestive degradation", JOURNAL OF FISH DISEASES, OXFORD, GB, vol. 12, no. 6, pages 579 - 584 [A] 1-4,9,11,12 * page 580, paragraph 4 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 81, no. 24, Database accession no. 81-43005D, & JPS5645405 A 19810425 (SHISEIDO KK) [A] 1-4,11,12 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 16, Database accession no. 89-118059, & JPS6463032 A 19890309 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-4,11,12 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0657105