EP0703730 - STABLE WATER-IN-OIL EMULSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states GIST-BROCADES B.V. Wateringseweg 1, P.O. Box 1 NL-2600 MA Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDENS, Luppo Hoflaan 118 NL-3062 JL Rotterdam / NL | 02 /
MEIJER, Dirk Kerkhofweg 79 NL-4835 GB Breda / NL | 03 /
VAN PARIDON, Petrus Andreas Eemwijkstraat 23 NL-2271 RD Voorburg / NL | [1996/14] | Representative(s) | Visser-Luirink, Gesina, et al DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Delft P.O. Box 1 2600 MA Delft / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | Visser-Luirink, Gesina, Dr., et al c/o GIST-BROCADES N.V., Patents and Trademarks Dept., Wateringseweg 1, P.O. Box 1 NL-2600 MA Delft / NL | Application number, filing date | 95916672.9 | 18.04.1995 | [1996/14] | WO1995EP01461 | Priority number, date | EP19940201067 | 18.04.1994 Original published format: EP 94201067 | [1996/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9528092 | Date: | 26.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0703730 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703730 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/16, A23K1/18, A23L1/035, A61K7/00, C11B3/00 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
C12N9/00 (EP);
A23D7/00 (KR);
A23K20/174 (EP);
A23K20/179 (EP);
A23K20/189 (EP);
A23K40/30 (EP);
A23K50/75 (EP);
A23L29/06 (EP);
A23L29/10 (EP);
A23L33/15 (EP);
A23L35/10 (EP);
A61K8/06 (EP);
A61K8/064 (EP);
A61K8/345 (EP);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61K8/60 (EP);
A61K8/66 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
C12Y301/00 (EP);
C12Y301/01003 (EP);
C12Y301/03 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/154, A23V2250/18, A23V2250/6406, A23V2250/032, A23V2250/708, A23V2200/222, A23V2250/30 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/154, A23V2250/30, A23V2250/642, A23V2250/18, A23V2200/222, A23V2250/192 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/14] | Title | German: | STABILE WASSER-IN-OEL EMULSIONEN | [1996/14] | English: | STABLE WATER-IN-OIL EMULSIONS | [1996/14] | French: | EMULSIONS HUILE DANS EAU STABLES | [1996/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 24.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.12.2001 | BE | 12.12.2001 | CH | 12.12.2001 | GR | 12.12.2001 | LI | 12.12.2001 | PT | 12.03.2002 | DE | 13.03.2002 | IE | 18.04.2002 | LU | 18.04.2002 | MC | 18.04.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/30] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
DE | 13.03.2002 | ||
IE | 18.04.2002 | ||
MC | 18.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
IE | 18.04.2002 | ||
MC | 18.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
MC | 18.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 12.12.2001 | |
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 12.12.2001 | |
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 12.12.2001 | |
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 12.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]SU562281 ; | [A]JPH0586368 ; | [A]JPS5645405 ; | [A]JPS6463032 ; | [X]US3958033 (SIMS REX J, et al) [X] 1-9,11,12 * column 6, line 33 - line 35 * * claims 1-4,6 *; | [X]US3966632 (COLLIOPOULOS JOHN A, et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-12 * column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 8 * * example 3 *; | [A]EP0174377 (MEIJI MILK PROD CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,6,8,11,12 * page 2, line 11 - page 8, line 9 * * example 8 * * claims 1,5,6 *; | [Y]EP0247552 (SO RI FAR S R L [IT]) [Y] 1-9,11,12 * column 1, line 1 - line 17 * * claims 1,7,8 *; | [A]US4869919 (LOWERY ARTHUR N [US]) [A] 1-4,6,8,11,12 * column 3, line 15 - line 54 * * claims 1-6,8,9 *; | [A]EP0354356 (COOPERLAT [IT]) [A] 1-4,11,12 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 5 *; | [DY]WO9206599 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [DY] 1-9,11,12 * page 5, line 23 - line 29 * * page 6, line 5 - line 6 * * claims 1-9 *; | [DA]WO9314645 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]WO9316175 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 78, no. 21, Database accession no. 78-37849A, & SU562281 A 19770912 (MOSCOW SVOBODA COSMETIC) [X] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 18, Database accession no. 93-149429, & JPH0586368 A 19930406 (MARINO FORUM 21 SH) [A] 1,6,8 * abstract * | [A] - A. LILLEHAUG, "Oral immunization of rainbow trout, Salmo gairdneri Richardson, against vibriosis with vaccines protected against digestive degradation", JOURNAL OF FISH DISEASES, OXFORD, GB, vol. 12, no. 6, pages 579 - 584 [A] 1-4,9,11,12 * page 580, paragraph 4 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 81, no. 24, Database accession no. 81-43005D, & JPS5645405 A 19810425 (SHISEIDO KK) [A] 1-4,11,12 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 16, Database accession no. 89-118059, & JPS6463032 A 19890309 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-4,11,12 * abstract * | Examination | EP0657105 |