Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0755308

EP0755308 - ENGINE CLEANER COMPOSITION, METHOD, AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Engine Fog, Inc.
9124 Cypress Green Drive
Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US
[1997/05]
Inventor(s)01 / ADAMS, Lawrence, J.
P.O. Box 2347
Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32004 / US
02 / HUGHETT, Paul, D.
4540 Carolyn Cove
Jacksonville, FL 32258 / US
[1997/05]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/05]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date95917007.714.04.1995
[1997/05]
WO1995US04674
Priority number, dateUS1994022779514.04.1994         Original published format: US 227795
[1997/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9528236
Date:26.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0755308
Date:29.01.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.1995
[1997/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0755308
Date:26.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.10.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B08B9/00, C11D7/32, C11D7/50, F02B77/04
[1997/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/05]
Extension statesSI14.11.1996
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON MOTOREN, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG[1997/05]
English:ENGINE CLEANER COMPOSITION, METHOD, AND APPARATUS[1997/05]
French:COMPOSITION DE NETTOYAGE DE MOTEURS ET PROCEDE ET APPAREIL ASSOCIES[1997/05]
Entry into regional phase14.11.1996National basic fee paid 
14.11.1996Search fee paid 
14.11.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/05]
14.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2002Fee for grant paid
11.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08]
Request for further processing for:20.06.2002Request for further processing filed
20.06.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.07.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.199703   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.1998
30.04.200107   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2001
30.04.200208   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.02.2003
BE26.02.2003
CH26.02.2003
FR26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
IT26.02.2003
LI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
IE14.04.2003
DK26.05.2003
GB26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
SE26.05.2003
DE27.05.2003
ES28.08.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]AT26.02.2003
BE26.02.2003
CH26.02.2003
FR26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
LI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
IE14.04.2003
DK26.05.2003
GB26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
SE26.05.2003
DE27.05.2003
ES28.08.2003
Former [2004/29]AT26.02.2003
BE26.02.2003
CH26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
LI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
IE14.04.2003
DK26.05.2003
GB26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
SE26.05.2003
DE27.05.2003
ES28.08.2003
Former [2004/22]AT26.02.2003
BE26.02.2003
CH26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
LI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
DK26.05.2003
GB26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
SE26.05.2003
DE27.05.2003
ES28.08.2003
Former [2004/10]AT26.02.2003
BE26.02.2003
CH26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
LI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
DK26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
SE26.05.2003
DE27.05.2003
ES28.08.2003
Former [2004/05]AT26.02.2003
CH26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
LI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
DK26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
SE26.05.2003
DE27.05.2003
ES28.08.2003
Former [2004/04]AT26.02.2003
CH26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
LI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
DK26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
SE26.05.2003
ES28.08.2003
Former [2004/02]AT26.02.2003
CH26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
LI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
DK26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
SE26.05.2003
Former [2003/47]AT26.02.2003
CH26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
LI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
PT26.05.2003
SE26.05.2003
Former [2003/46]CH26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
LI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
PT26.05.2003
SE26.05.2003
Former [2003/43]CH26.02.2003
LI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
PT26.05.2003
SE26.05.2003
Former [2003/41]CH26.02.2003
LI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
SE26.05.2003
Former [2003/40]CH26.02.2003
LI26.02.2003
SE26.05.2003
Former [2003/32]SE26.05.2003
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US4746420  (DARIAN SAEED T [US], et al);
 [Y]US4780235  (JACKSON HAROLD L [US]);
 [Y]US4784170  (ROMANELLI PATRICK [US], et al);
 [Y]US4807578  (ADAMS LAWRENCE J [US], et al);
 [Y]US4920996  (FLANNER LLOYD T [US]);
 [Y]US4992187  (ADAMS LAWRENCE J [US], et al)