blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0708666 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0708666



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 140
16.10.2002 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.10.2002 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.11.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
08.08.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.08.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
08.08.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.06.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
30.05.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
30.05.2001 Description Search / examination 1
30.05.2001 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
30.03.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.03.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
26.02.2001 General enquiry Search / examination 1
07.06.2000 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
20.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
20.09.1999 Description Search / examination 8
20.09.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
17.09.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 16
08.07.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.06.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.03.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
04.03.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.02.1996 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.1996 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.1996 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.01.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.01.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
17.01.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
03.01.1996 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
30.11.1995 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
30.11.1995 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 18
30.11.1995 Priority document Search / examination 22