blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0708666
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPH09500813Global Dossier 28.01.1997A
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
US9504874 21.04.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0708666Global Dossier 12.12.2001B1
EP0708666 01.05.1996A1
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
US9504874 21.04.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT210475T 15.12.2001T
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
US9504874 21.04.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9506252 16.04.1996A
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
US9504874 21.04.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69524538D 24.01.2002D1
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
US9504874 21.04.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69524538T 01.08.2002T2
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
US9504874 21.04.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0708666T 18.03.2002T3
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
US9504874 21.04.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9532014Global Dossier 30.11.1995A1
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2003293960Global Dossier 15.10.2003A
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2165422 20.11.1995A1
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2169757T 16.07.2002T3
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MX9600252 30.11.1998A
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT708666E 31.05.2002E
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW312618B 11.08.1997B
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5421208 06.06.1995A
Priority number Date
US24578194 19.05.1994