Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0708666

EP0708666 - INSTANTANEOUS VOLUME MEASUREMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR NON-INVASIVELY MEASURING LIQUID PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.12.2002  [2002/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US
Former [1996/18]For all designated states
BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC.
One Baxter Parkway - 2E
Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PACKARD, Warren, J.
4734 North Central Avenue
Chicago, IL 60630 / US
02 / PAWLAK, Kenneth, E.
429 Appleton Drive
Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US
[1996/18]
Representative(s)MacGregor, Gordon
Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/18]MacGregor, Gordon
ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate
Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB
Application number, filing date95917087.921.04.1995
[1996/18]
WO1995US04874
Priority number, dateUS1994024578119.05.1994         Original published format: US 245781
[1996/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9532014
Date:30.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0708666
Date:01.05.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1995
[1996/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0708666
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/168, G01F1/34, G01F1/90, G01F17/00
[1996/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/18]
TitleGerman:AUGENBLICKLICHE VOLUMENMESSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR UNBLUTIGE MESSUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITSPARAMETERN[1996/18]
English:INSTANTANEOUS VOLUME MEASUREMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR NON-INVASIVELY MEASURING LIQUID PARAMETERS[1996/18]
French:SYSTEME DE MESURE INSTANTANEE DE MESURE DE VOLUMES ET PROCEDE NON INVASIF DE MESURE DES PARAMETRES D'UN LIQUIDE[1996/18]
Entry into regional phase08.01.1996National basic fee paid 
08.01.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/18]
26.02.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
17.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
17.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
13.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
21.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2001Fee for grant paid
10.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
06.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO9420158  (DEKA PRODUCTS LP) [XP] 1-14 * claims 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9013795  (DEKA PRODUCTS LP) [X] 1,2,6,9,10,13,14 * figures 1-5; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO8901795  (KAMEN DEAN L) [X] 1,2,6,9,10,13,14 * figure 1; claim 1 *