Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0758378

EP0758378 - THERMOSTABLE XYLANASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
4 Cambridge Place, 1870 Winton Road South Rochester
New York 14618 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/08]For all designated states
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
4 Cambridge Place, 1870 Winton Road South
Rochester, New York 14618 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BODIE, Elisabeth, A.
Genencor International, Inc. 180 Kimball Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
02 / CUEVAS, William, A.
Genencor International, Inc. 180 Kimball Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
03 / KOLJONEN, Marja
Valkonauhantic 6 A 8
FIN-02700 Kaunianinen / US
[1997/08]
Representative(s)Kiddle, Simon John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/08]Kiddle, Simon John , et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date95917136.428.04.1995
[1997/08]
WO1995US05016
Priority number, dateUS1994023433828.04.1994         Original published format: US 234338
[1997/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9529998
Date:09.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0758378
Date:19.02.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.1995
[1997/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0758378
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search reportEP09.11.1995
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/24, C12P21/00, D21C9/10
[1997/08]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/05]
Former [1997/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:THERMOSTABILE XYLANASEN[1997/08]
English:THERMOSTABLE XYLANASES[1997/08]
French:XYLANASES THERMOSTABLES[1997/08]
Entry into regional phase18.11.1996National basic fee paid 
18.11.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/08]
10.02.1997Request for accelerated examination filed
05.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.1997Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
18.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.1999Fee for grant paid
07.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99102458.9  / EP0926234
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Request for further processing for:09.06.1998Request for further processing filed
11.06.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.06.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0188050  (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP]) [X] 4 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GHANGAS G. S. ET AL., "Cloning of a Thermomonospora fusca xylanase gene and its expression in Escherichia coli and Streptomyces lividans", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1989), vol. 171, no. 6, pages 2963 - 2969, [A] * the whole document *
 [A]  - NAKAMURA S. ET AL., "Purification and some properties of an alkaline xylanase from alkaliphilic Bacillus sp. Strain 41M-1", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (199307), vol. 59, no. 7, pages 2311 - 2316, [A] * the whole document *
Examination   - HOLTZ C. ET AL: "Production and properties of xylanases from thermophilic actinomycetes". ANTONIE VAN LEEUWENHOEK, NL, 1991, vol. 59, pages 1 to 7