Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0714558

EP0714558 - RADIATION-EMITTING SEMICONDUCTOR INDEX-GUIDED DIODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.1999
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Uniphase Opto Holdings, Inc.
163 Baypointe Parkway San Jose
California 95134 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/18]For all designated states
Uniphase Opto Holdings, Inc.
163 Baypointe Parkway
San Jose, California 95134 / US
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1998/35]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1996/23]For all designated states
Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / SCHEMMANN, Marcel, Franz, Christian
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
02 / VAN DER POEL, Carolus, Johannes
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
03 / ACKET, Gerard, Adriaan
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[1996/23]
Representative(s)Smeets, Eugenius Theodorus J. M. , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1996/23]Smeets, Eugenius Theodorus J. M. , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date95917447.519.05.1995
[1996/23]
WO1995IB00384
Priority number, dateEP1994020175320.06.1994         Original published format: EP 94201753
[1996/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9535582
Date:28.12.1995
[1995/55]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0714558
Date:05.06.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.1995
[1996/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0714558
Date:20.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE22.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:H01L33/00, H01S3/19
[1996/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1996/23]
TitleGerman:INDEXGEFÜHRTE LICHTEMITTIERENDE HALBLEITERDIODE[1996/23]
English:RADIATION-EMITTING SEMICONDUCTOR INDEX-GUIDED DIODE[1996/23]
French:DIODE A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS RAYONNANTE GUIDEE PAR INDICE[1996/23]
Entry into regional phase20.03.1996National basic fee paid 
20.03.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/35]
27.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.04.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.1998Fee for grant paid
27.07.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.10.1999No opposition filed within time limit [2000/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL20.01.1999
DE21.04.1999
GB19.05.1999
[2003/08]
Former [2001/05]DE21.04.1999
GB19.05.1999
Former [2000/12]DE21.04.1999
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5276699  ;
 [XAY]US4745612  ;
 [A]US5287377  ;
 [A]US5289484  ;
 [A]US4615032
 [YA]  - ELECTRONIC LETTERS, Volume 25, No. 4, February 1989, NIDO M. et al., "High power and Low optical feedback noise A1GaAs single Quantum Well Lasers", figure 1, see whole document.
 [A]  - IEEE PROCEEDINGS - J., Volume 138, No. 2, April 1991, LANG H. et al., "GaAS/A1GaAs quantum well laser for high-speed applications", pages 1 - page 3.
 [A]  - APPL. PHYS. LETTERS, Volume 56, No. 3, January 1990, MING C. WU et al., "A 970 nm strained-layer InGaAs/GaAIAs quantum well laser for pumping an erbium-doped optical fiber amplifier", see whole document.