Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0715861

EP0715861 - LIQUID INJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2001
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIKEN IKI CO. LTD.
4-16, Uchihon-machi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 540 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/41]For all designated states
DAIKEN IKI CO. LTD.
4-16, Uchihon-machi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540 / JP
Former [1996/24]For all designated states
DAIKEN IKI CO. LTD.
4-16, Uchinon-machi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMADA, Keiichi, Daiken Iki Co., Ltd.
4-16, Uchihon-machi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 540 / JP
02 / YAMANAKA, Junichi, Daiken Iki Co., Ltd.
4-16, Uchihon-machi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 540 / JP
[1996/24]
Representative(s)Hering, Hartmut
Patentanwälte
Berendt, Leyh & Hering
Innere Wiener Strasse 20
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/24]Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20
D-81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date95917475.624.04.1995
[1996/24]
WO1995JP00831
Priority number, dateJP1994009031727.04.1994         Original published format: JP 9031794
[1996/24]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9528977
Date:02.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0715861
Date:12.06.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1995
[1996/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0715861
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.11.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/14, A61M5/19
[1996/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/24]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM INJIZIEREN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN[1996/24]
English:LIQUID INJECTION DEVICE[1996/24]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE LIQUIDES[1996/24]
Entry into regional phase08.12.1995Translation filed 
05.01.1996National basic fee paid 
05.01.1996Search fee paid 
05.01.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/24]
13.05.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
08.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
07.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2000Fee for grant paid
21.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.08.2000
BE02.08.2000
CH02.08.2000
ES02.08.2000
FR02.08.2000
IT02.08.2000
LI02.08.2000
NL02.08.2000
DK02.11.2000
SE02.11.2000
DE03.11.2000
GB24.04.2001
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]AT02.08.2000
BE02.08.2000
CH02.08.2000
ES02.08.2000
FR02.08.2000
LI02.08.2000
NL02.08.2000
DK02.11.2000
SE02.11.2000
DE03.11.2000
GB24.04.2001
Former [2003/45]AT02.08.2000
BE02.08.2000
CH02.08.2000
ES02.08.2000
LI02.08.2000
NL02.08.2000
DK02.11.2000
SE02.11.2000
DE03.11.2000
FR29.12.2000
GB24.04.2001
Former [2003/08]AT02.08.2000
BE02.08.2000
CH02.08.2000
ES02.08.2000
LI02.08.2000
NL02.08.2000
SE02.11.2000
DE03.11.2000
FR29.12.2000
GB24.04.2001
Former [2002/26]AT02.08.2000
BE02.08.2000
CH02.08.2000
ES02.08.2000
LI02.08.2000
SE02.11.2000
DE03.11.2000
FR29.12.2000
GB24.04.2001
Former [2002/16]AT02.08.2000
BE02.08.2000
CH02.08.2000
LI02.08.2000
SE02.11.2000
DE03.11.2000
FR29.12.2000
GB24.04.2001
Former [2002/13]AT02.08.2000
BE02.08.2000
CH02.08.2000
LI02.08.2000
SE02.11.2000
DE03.11.2000
FR29.12.2000
Former [2002/02]AT02.08.2000
BE02.08.2000
CH02.08.2000
LI02.08.2000
SE02.11.2000
FR29.12.2000
Former [2001/27]AT02.08.2000
BE02.08.2000
SE02.11.2000
FR29.12.2000
Former [2001/24]AT02.08.2000
BE02.08.2000
FR29.12.2000
Former [2001/22]AT02.08.2000
BE02.08.2000
Former [2001/17]AT02.08.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9201484  (KABI PHARMACIA AB [SE]) [A] 1,3,8 * column A; figures 3-5 *
International search[Y]JP4507058  ;
 [Y]JPS5359286  (PYE ELECTRONIC PROD LTD);
 [A]JPH05176997  (ISHIKAWA TOICHI);
 [A]JP4501367