Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0711385

EP0711385 - DRIVE ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boge Kompressoren
Otto Boge GmbH & Co. KG, Lechtermannshof 26
D-33739 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/20]For all designated states
Boge Kompressoren
Otto Boge GmbH & Co. KG, Lechtermannshof 26
D-33739 Bielefeld / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BEUTEL, Wolfgang
Neustadt 30
D-32791 Lage / DE
02 / EWERTOWSKI, Julius
Mohnblumenweg 4
D-32130 Enger / DE
[1996/20]
Representative(s)Weber, Joachim
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/20]Weber, Joachim, Dr.
Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber Patentanwälte Ludwig-Ganghofer-Strasse 20
82031 Grünwald / DE
Application number, filing date95917933.418.04.1995
[1996/20]
WO1995EP01443
Priority number, dateDE1994441342218.04.1994         Original published format: DE 4413422
[1996/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9528570
Date:26.10.1995
Language:DE
[1995/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0711385
Date:15.05.1996
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.1995
[1996/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0711385
Date:16.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.10.1995
ClassificationInternational:F04C29/00, F04C15/00, F16H7/10
[1996/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/20]
TitleGerman:ANTRIEBSANORDNUNG[1996/20]
English:DRIVE ARRANGEMENT[1996/20]
French:SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT[1996/20]
Entry into regional phase16.10.1995National basic fee paid 
16.10.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
26.04.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/31]
15.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.06.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.1998Fee for grant paid
26.08.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.07.1999  05.08.1999  ADMISSIBLE
CompAir Drucklufttechnik GmbH
Argenthaler Str. 11
55469 Simmern / DE
Opponent's representative
Holtfoth, Hans-Jürgen
Oppenheimer Strasse 42
55130 Mainz / DE
 [2001/20]
Former [1999/37]
Opponent(s)01  16.07.1999  05.08.1999  ADMISSIBLE
CompAir Drucklufttechnik GmbH
Argenthaler Str. 11
55469 Simmern / DE
29.10.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.12.1999Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: opposition inadmissible 01
23.10.2003Date of oral proceedings
09.01.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.01.2004Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
27.01.2005Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2005/12]
Appeal following opposition25.02.2004Appeal received No.  T0312/04
19.05.2004Statement of grounds filed
03.09.2004Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent deemed not to be filed
24.04.2002Date of oral proceedings
02.05.2002Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4568030  (WEICHEL) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4094205  (COOK) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2093149  (PACKAGED AIR CONDITIONING EQUIPMENT LTD.) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS5566248  ;
 [A]DE156042  (HUNDHAUSEN) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE138124  (HUNDHAUSEN) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800806), vol. 4, no. 109, Database accession no. (E - 020), & JP55066248 A 19800519 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract *
other   - ERSATZTEILSTUECKLISTE (mit Explosionszeichnung)
    - KAESER COMPRESSORS 'More Compressed Air Less Energy'