Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0711385 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0711385



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 669
31.01.2005 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
27.01.2005 F3026 Closure of appeal proceedings: non-payment of the appeal fee Appeal 2
26.06.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.06.2004 F3019 Communication of loss of rights: non-payment of the appeal fee Appeal 1
23.06.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.05.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.05.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
25.05.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.05.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
25.05.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
25.05.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
19.05.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 22
01.04.2004 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
11.03.2004 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.03.2004 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.03.2004 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
25.02.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
17.01.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.01.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.01.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.01.2004 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
09.01.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
09.01.2004 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 3
09.01.2004 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
09.01.2004 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
09.01.2004 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
20.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
17.10.2003 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 4
23.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 4
25.06.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.06.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.06.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.06.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.06.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
20.06.2003 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
20.06.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
20.06.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
28.05.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.05.2002 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
24.05.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 22
22.05.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
22.05.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
02.05.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
24.04.2002 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
09.04.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
09.04.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
09.04.2002 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
09.04.2002 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
09.04.2002 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
09.04.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.01.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.01.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.01.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
10.01.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
10.01.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.01.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
07.11.2001 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 5
07.11.2001 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
07.11.2001 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
07.11.2001 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
07.11.2001 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
27.09.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.09.2001 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
20.09.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
11.06.2001 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.06.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.06.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
02.06.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.06.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 50
02.06.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
12.04.2001 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
06.04.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
30.03.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.03.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
24.03.2001 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
24.03.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.03.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.03.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.02.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.02.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.02.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.02.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
08.02.2001 Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent Opposition 2
08.02.2001 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
08.02.2001 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 5
08.02.2001 Means of redress Opposition 1
08.02.2001 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.10.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.10.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.07.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.07.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.07.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
19.07.2000 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
19.07.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
19.07.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
28.06.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.06.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.06.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.03.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.02.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.02.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.02.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.02.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.02.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.02.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.02.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
20.12.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.12.1999 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
29.10.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.10.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.07.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.07.1999 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
16.07.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.07.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.07.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
16.07.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.07.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
16.07.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.07.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
16.07.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
05.11.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.08.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.08.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.08.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.06.1998 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
09.06.1998 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.02.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
06.02.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
27.01.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
19.11.1997 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 4
13.11.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
13.11.1997 Description Search / examination 4
13.11.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.08.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
06.08.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.07.1997 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.04.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.03.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.03.1997 Annex Search / examination 3
10.03.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.03.1997 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
07.03.1997 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.03.1997 Annex Search / examination 1
01.03.1997 Annex Search / examination 1
01.03.1997 Annex Search / examination 4
01.03.1997 Annex Search / examination 1
01.03.1997 Annex Search / examination 1
01.03.1997 Annex Search / examination 1
01.03.1997 Annex Search / examination 2
01.03.1997 Annex Search / examination 1
01.03.1997 Annex Search / examination 2
01.03.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
25.02.1997 Annex Search / examination 9
25.02.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
21.02.1997 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
21.02.1997 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
17.06.1996 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
07.06.1996 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 1
05.06.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.05.1996 Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party Search / examination 1
20.05.1996 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.04.1996 Annex Search / examination 2
26.04.1996 Annex Search / examination 1
26.04.1996 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
26.04.1996 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.04.1996 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
02.04.1996 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 1
02.04.1996 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 3
02.04.1996 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
19.03.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.03.1996 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.03.1996 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
15.03.1996 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
28.11.1995 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
26.10.1995 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 8
26.10.1995 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 24
26.10.1995 Priority document Search / examination 20
16.10.1995 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5