Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0760705

EP0760705 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL PUZZLE GAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Distributions Muralex Inc.
934 Cote de Liesse Road Town of Mount Royal
Quebec H4T 2A5 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Distributions Muralex Inc.
934 Cote de Liesse Road
Town of Mount Royal, Quebec H4T 2A5 / CA
Former [1997/11]For all designated states
Distributions Muralex Inc.
5934 Cote de Liesse Road
Town of Mount Royal, Quebec H4T 2A5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / BENOIT, Pierre
365 Leacross
Mont-Royal, Québec H3P 1L9 / CA
02 / GAREAU, David
109 Denault
Kirkland, Québec H3J 3X4 / CA
[1997/11]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel , et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/11]Casalonga, Axel , et al
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date95918493.824.05.1995
[1997/11]
WO1995CA00305
Priority number, dateCA1994212424325.05.1994         Original published format: CA 2124243
[1997/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9532037
Date:30.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0760705
Date:12.03.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1995
[1997/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0760705
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.1995
ClassificationInternational:A63F9/12, A63H33/04
[1997/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/11]
Extension statesLT04.12.1996
LV04.12.1996
SI04.12.1996
TitleGerman:DREIDIMENSIONALES PUZZLESPIEL[1997/11]
English:THREE-DIMENSIONAL PUZZLE GAME[1997/11]
French:PUZZLE TRIDIMENSIONNEL[1997/11]
Entry into regional phase04.12.1996National basic fee paid 
04.12.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/11]
04.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2000Fee for grant paid
05.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR05.04.2000
[2004/07]
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4824112  (ROY RAY [US]) [Y] 1-44 * column 5, line 46 - line 61; figure 7B *;
 [Y]EP0531662  (279 8140 CANADA INC [CA]) [Y] 1-44 * column 4, line 3 - line 53 *;
 [A]US4254574  (STOCK ROBERT) [A] 9-13,25-29 * claim 1 *