Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0757782

EP0757782 - CORIOLIS MASS FLOW RATE METER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIRECT MEASUREMENT CORPORATION
1121 Deleware Avenue, No. 3
Longmont, CO 80501 / US
[1997/07]
Inventor(s)01 / CAGE, Donald, R.
6 Placer Avenue
Longmont, CO 80501 / US
02 / CAMPBELL, Steven, W.
c/o Direct Measurement Corp. 14122 Mead Street
Longmont, CO 80504 / US
03 / HAHN, David, T.
1506 Dennison Circle
Longmont, CO 80501 / US
 [2003/24]
Former [1997/07]01 / CAGE, Donald, R.
6 Placer Avenue
Longmont, CO 80501 / US
02 / CAMPBELL, Steven, W.
Apartment F125 2540 Sunset Drive
Longmont, CO 80501 / US
03 / HAHN, David, T.
1506 Dennison Circle
Longmont, CO 80501 / US
Representative(s)Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1997/07]Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date95918855.818.04.1995
[1997/07]
WO1995US05161
Priority number, dateUS1994023368726.04.1994         Original published format: US 233687
[1997/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9529386
Date:02.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0757782
Date:12.02.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1995
[1997/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0757782
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.11.1995
ClassificationInternational:G01F1/84
[1997/07]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   LI [1997/07]
TitleGerman:CORIOLIS-MASSENDURCHFLUSSMESSER[1997/07]
English:CORIOLIS MASS FLOW RATE METER[1997/07]
French:DEBITMETRE MASSIQUE DE CORIOLIS[1997/07]
Entry into regional phase16.10.1996National basic fee paid 
16.10.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.10.1996Examination requested  [1997/07]
09.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
05.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
28.03.2003Fee for grant paid
28.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP98201112.4  / EP0867694
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Request for further processing for:28.03.2003Request for further processing filed
28.03.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.04.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
DK11.09.2003
[2004/29]
Former [2004/01]CH11.06.2003
LI11.06.2003
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO9214123  (D. CAGE) [AD] 1,15,29,36,53 * abstract * * page 14, line 30 - page 15, line 14 * * page 17, line 32 - page 19, line 6; figures 1-24 *;
 [AD]EP0316908  (FLOWTEC AG) [AD] 1,15,29,36,53 * column A * * column 7, line 6 - line 17 * * column 8, line 31 - column 9, line 22; figures 1A-D,2 *;
 [A]EP0282217  (SCHLUMBERGER ELECTRONICS (U.K.) LIMITED) [A] 1,15,29,36,53 * column A *;
 [A]EP0253504  (SCHLUMBERGER ELECTRONICS (U.K.) LIMITED) [A] 1,15,29,36,53 * column A *;
 [A]JPS58153121
 [A]  - F.CASCETTA, "A new straight pipe Coriolis mass flowmeter: the experimental characterisation", MEASUREMENTS, LONDON GB, vol. 9, no. 4, pages 176 - 180, XP000277390 [A] 1,15,29,36,53 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0263-2241(91)90015-I
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831207), vol. 7, no. 274, Database accession no. (P - 241)<1419> , & JP58153121 A 19830912 (TAKAHARU MATSUMOTO) [A] 1,15,29,36,53 * abstract *