Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0760016

EP0760016 - SCRAP METAL GRAVITY FEED METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2001Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 18.04.2001 [2001/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PREMELT SYSTEMS, INC.
2932 Business One Drive
Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
Premelt Systems, Inc.
2932 Business One Drive
Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US
Former [1997/10]For all designated states
PREMELT SYSTEMS, INC.
2205 Miller Road
Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AREAUX, Larry D.
33615 Wapiti Circle
Buena Vista, CO 81211 / US
[1997/10]
Representative(s)Marsden, John Christopher
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/10]Marsden, John Christopher
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date95919077.808.05.1995
[1997/10]
WO1995US05760
Priority number, dateUS1994024026910.05.1994         Original published format: US 240269
[1997/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9530778
Date:16.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0760016
Date:05.03.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1995
[1997/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0760016
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.11.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:C22B9/16, C22B7/00, C21C5/56
[1997/31]
Former International [1997/10]C22B9/16
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT [2000/11]
Former [1997/10]BE,  CH,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IE,  IT,  NL,  PT 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESCHICKEN VON SCHROTT MITTELS SCHWERKRAFT[1999/34]
English:SCRAP METAL GRAVITY FEED METHOD AND APPARATUS[1997/10]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ALIMENTATION PAR GRAVITE, DESTINES AU CHARGEMENT DE MITRAILLES[1999/34]
Former [1997/10]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESCHICKEN VON SCHROTT MITTELS DER SCHWERKRAFT
Former [1997/10]PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ALIMENTATION PAR GRAVITE, DESTINES AU CHARGEMENT DES MITRAILLES
Entry into regional phase10.12.1996National basic fee paid 
10.12.1996Search fee paid 
10.12.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/10]
02.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.1999Fee for grant paid
27.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPT05.07.2000
[2001/16]
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE8412739U  (FUCHS SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH) [Y] 1,7,8,12,13 * page 4 - page 6; figures 1,7; claims 1,12 *;
 [Y]US3441651  (VIENS GEORGE E, et al) [Y] 1,7,8,12,13 * figures 1,4,5 *;
 [Y]US4907784  (KUSAKA KAZUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,7,8,12,13 * figure 1; claims 1-6 *;
 [YDA]US4872907  (AREAUX LARRY D [US]) [YD] 1,7,8,12,13 * figure 3; claims 25,28,38-40 * [A] 2,3,9-11;
 [A]WO8603783  (KORTEC AG [CH]) [A] 2,3 * figure 1; claims 1,5-7 *;
 [A]US3873305  (CLAXTON RAYMOND J, et al) [A] 1,12,13 * figure 2; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US4877449  (KHINKIS MARK J [US]) [A] 1,12,13 * column 2 - column 3; figure 1 *
International search[X]US5211744  (AREAUX LARRY D [US], et al);
 [X]US2402498  (NORMAN KOHLHEPP);
 [A]US4702768  (AREAUX LARRY D [US], et al)