Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0723391

EP0723391 - MOBILE CONTROL SYSTEM RESPONSIVE TO LAND AREA MAPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  29.10.2004
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AG-CHEM EQUIPMENT CO., Inc.
Suite 100 5720 Smetana Drive
Minnetonka, MN 55343-9688 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/31]For all designated states
AG-CHEM EQUIPMENT CO., Inc.
5720 Smetana Drive No. 100
Minnetonka, Minnesota 55343-9688 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MONSON, Robert J.
1027 Brenner Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55113 / US
02 / DAHLEN, Eric M.
903 Stryker Avenue
West St. Paul, MN 55118 / US
[1996/31]
Representative(s)Altenburg, Udo , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Altenburg, Udo , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [1996/31]Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date95919167.711.05.1995
[1996/31]
WO1995US05953
Priority number, dateUS1994024350616.05.1994         Original published format: US 243506
[1996/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9531090
Date:23.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0723391
Date:31.07.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.1995
[1996/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0723391
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.11.1995
ClassificationInternational:A01C17/00, A01M7/00
[1996/31]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/10]
Former [1996/31]BE,  CH,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL 
TitleGerman:AUF BODENFLÄCHEN REAGIERENDES MOBILES STEUERUNGSSYSTEM[1996/31]
English:MOBILE CONTROL SYSTEM RESPONSIVE TO LAND AREA MAPS[1996/31]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE MOBILE REAGISSANT A DES CARTES DE SURFACES AGRICOLES[1996/31]
Entry into regional phase06.12.1996National basic fee paid 
06.12.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.12.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/05]
17.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
05.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
22.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.1999Fee for grant paid
02.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.10.2000  20.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Maasland N.V.
Weverskade 10
NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL
Opponent's representative
Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V.
Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1
3147 PB Maassluis / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2000/50]
Opponent(s)01  19.10.2000   
Maasland N.V.
Weverskade 10
NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL
Opponent's representative
Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
23.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.06.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.10.2002Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.12.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.10.2004Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/51]
19.10.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition30.01.2003Appeal received No.  T0151/03
11.04.2003Statement of grounds filed
21.05.2004Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2004/21]
12.07.2004Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2004/29]
19.10.2004Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
BE31.05.2001
[2008/06]
Former [2003/08]NL19.01.2000
BE31.05.2001
Former [2002/29]BE31.05.2001
Cited inInternational search[X]US4176395  (EVELYN-VEERE RENE H [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 68 * * column 29, line 20 - column 30, line 21 * * column 34, line 65 - column 35, line 65; figures 1,4,7; claim 18 *;
 [X]WO9304434  (MICRO TRAK SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * page 8, line 27 - page 10, line 32 * * page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 37 * * page 13, line 24 - line 31; figure 1 2A 2C * * claim 11 *;
 [X]FR2665051  (SADIMATO SA [FR]) [X] 1-9 * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 7; figures 1,2 *