Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0759724 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0759724



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 464
24.09.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
04.10.2006 Closing of application Search / examination 2
29.09.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.09.2006 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.09.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.09.2006 Claims Appeal 2
07.09.2006 Cover page: Decision (ex parte) Appeal 10
07.09.2006 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
07.09.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.09.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.09.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.09.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 5
06.09.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.09.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 5
05.09.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.09.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.09.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
05.09.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
05.09.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
01.09.2006 Claims Appeal 3
01.09.2006 Claims Appeal 3
01.09.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
31.08.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 30
30.08.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 6
21.08.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.08.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.08.2006 Claims Appeal 2
11.08.2006 Claims Appeal 2
11.08.2006 Description Appeal 3
11.08.2006 Description Appeal 4
11.08.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
07.08.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 16
05.07.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
05.05.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.05.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.05.2006 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 3
27.03.2006 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
22.03.2006 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.03.2006 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 7
30.07.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
05.07.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
01.07.2004 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
29.04.2004 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
06.04.2004 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
15.03.2004 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.03.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
27.02.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
23.02.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 37
20.02.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 38
17.11.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
31.10.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.10.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.10.2003 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
20.10.2003 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
20.10.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 4
20.10.2003 Means of redress Search / examination 1
16.10.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
16.10.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.10.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
16.10.2003 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.10.2003 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
29.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
24.09.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
24.09.2003 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.09.2003 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
22.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
22.09.2003 Description Search / examination 1
22.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.09.2003 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 3
19.09.2003 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
19.09.2003 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
19.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 6
19.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 6
15.09.2003 Description Search / examination 1
15.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 4
08.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
31.07.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.07.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.07.2003 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
22.07.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.07.2003 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.11.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
27.11.2002 Description Search / examination 5
27.11.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.11.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
15.11.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.11.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.11.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.09.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.08.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.08.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.05.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
06.05.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.06.1998 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
08.06.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
21.05.1997 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
07.02.1997 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
22.01.1997 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.01.1997 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
05.12.1996 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.11.1996 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
15.11.1996 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
02.07.1996 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of filling/search fee) Search / examination 1
17.04.1996 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 1
08.02.1996 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
30.11.1995 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
30.11.1995 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 46
30.11.1995 Priority document Search / examination 42