Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0761007 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0761007



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 277
11.09.2001 Closing of application Search / examination 2
03.09.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.08.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.07.2001 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 12
26.07.2001 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
18.07.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.06.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
14.04.2001 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.04.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
03.04.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
03.04.2001 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
28.03.2001 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.09.2000 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
07.07.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
03.07.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
28.06.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
02.05.2000 Processing of an appeal Search / examination 1
30.03.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
20.03.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.01.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.12.1999 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
22.11.1999 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 6
22.11.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.09.1999 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 10
28.07.1999 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
02.07.1999 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
28.06.1999 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
22.06.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
15.06.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.05.1999 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 3
04.05.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
03.05.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.04.1999 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.08.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 16
04.08.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 16
28.05.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
12.03.1998 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 2
06.03.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.03.1998 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 3
06.03.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
06.03.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
17.02.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
11.02.1998 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
02.02.1998 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
29.01.1998 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 2
20.01.1998 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
12.01.1998 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
20.12.1997 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.09.1997 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
25.09.1997 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
19.09.1997 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
08.07.1997 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
29.01.1997 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.12.1996 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.12.1996 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.11.1996 Claims Search / examination 4
25.11.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.11.1996 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
13.08.1996 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
13.08.1996 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
13.02.1996 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.12.1995 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
07.12.1995 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 32
07.12.1995 Priority document Search / examination 36