Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0766790

EP0766790 - ROTARY DISPLACEMENT COMPRESSOR WITH LIQUID CIRCULATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2001
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SVENSKA ROTOR MASKINER AB
P.O. Box 15085
S-104 65 Stockholm / SE
[1997/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ERIKSSON, Leif
Fjärdholmsgränd 11A
S-127 44 Skärholmen / SE
02 / TIMUSKA, Karlis
Kälvestavägen 44
S-163 54 Spanga / SE
[1997/15]
Representative(s)Waldinger, Ake
Svenska Rotor Maskiner AB
Box 15085
104 65 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Waldinger, Ake
Svenska Rotor Maskiner AB Box 15085
104 65 Stockholm / SE
Former [1997/15]Waldinger, Ake
Roslinvägen 41
161 55 Bromma / SE
Application number, filing date95919702.107.04.1995
[1997/15]
WO1995SE00377
Priority number, dateSE1994000217721.06.1994         Original published format: SE 9402177
[1997/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9535446
Date:28.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/55]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0766790
Date:09.04.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.1995
[1997/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0766790
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE28.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:F04C18/16, // F04C29/02, F01C1/16
[1997/15]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1997/15]
TitleGerman:ROTATIONSKOMPRESSOR MIT FLÜSSIGKEITSZIRKULATIONSSYSTEM[1997/15]
English:ROTARY DISPLACEMENT COMPRESSOR WITH LIQUID CIRCULATION SYSTEM[1997/15]
French:COMPRESSEUR ROTATIF A RECIRCULATION DU LIQUIDE[1997/15]
Entry into regional phase10.12.1996National basic fee paid 
10.12.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
11.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/15]
01.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2000Fee for grant paid
15.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL05.07.2000
SE05.10.2000
[2003/08]
Former [2001/27]SE05.10.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]US4394113  (BAMMERT KARL [DE]);
 [A]GB2008684  (STAL REFRIGERATION AB)