EP0758884 - ACTIVE SUBSTANCE CONTROLLED RELEASE DEVICES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme AG Lohmannstrasse 2 56626 Andernach / DE | [2001/09] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme GmbH Irlicher Strasse 55 56567 Neuwied / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CREMER, Karsten Eifelstrasse 4a 53119 Bonn / DE | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus · Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr. Patentanwalt Sperlingsweg 32 50389 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 95920805.9 | 08.05.1995 | [1997/09] | WO1995EP01725 | Priority number, date | DE19944416926 | 13.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4416926 | [1997/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9531185 | Date: | 23.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758884 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758884 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
A61K9/2095 (EP);
A61K9/2072 (EP);
A61K9/2086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/09] | Extension states | SI | 14.11.1996 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR KONTROLLIERTEN FREISETZUNG VON WIRKSTOFFEN | [1997/09] | English: | ACTIVE SUBSTANCE CONTROLLED RELEASE DEVICES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [1997/09] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE LIBERATION CONTROLEE DE PRINCIPES ACTIFS ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1997/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 19.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.12.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 05.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99114947.7 / EP0965337 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9407470 (PFIZER [US], et al) [X] 1 * claim 11 *; | [E]DE4341442 (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE]) [E] 1-5,7,11 * claim 1 ** column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 15 * |