Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0759993

EP0759993 - DNA SEQUENCES CODING FOR ENZYMES CAPABLE OF FACILITATING THE SYNTHESIS OF LINEAR ALPHA-1,4 GLUCANS IN PLANTS, FUNGI AND MICROORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/10]DNA SEQUENCES CODING FOR ENZYMES CAPABLE OF FACILITATING THE SYNTHESIS OF LINEAR $g(a)-1,4 GLUCANS IN PLANTS, FUNGI AND MICROORGANISMS
[2007/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2008
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.07.2008  [2008/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer BioScience GmbH
Hermannswerder 20a
14473 Potsdam / DE
[2004/20]
Former [2004/03]For all designated states
PlantTec Biotechnologie GmbH
Forschung & Entwicklung, Hermannswerder 20a
14473 Potsdam / DE
Former [1998/50]For all designated states
Planttec Biotechnologie GmbH
Forschung & Entwicklung, Hermannswerder 14
14473 Potsdam / DE
Former [1997/23]For all designated states
Hoechst Schering AgrEvo GmbH
Miraustrasse 54
13509 Berlin / DE
Former [1997/10]For all designated states
INSTITUT FÜR GENBIOLOGISCHE FORSCHUNG BERLIN GMBH
Ihnestr.63
14195 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KOSSMANN, Jens
27 Otto du Plessis Rd.
Somerset West 7130 / ZA
02 / BÜTTCHER, Volker
Hundebreite 39
37697 Lauenförde / DE
03 / WELSH, Thomas
Schönburgstrasse 20
12103 Berlin / DE
 [2007/32]
Former [2007/16]01 / KOSSMANN, Jens
Golmer Fichten 9
14476 Golm / DE
02 / BÜTTCHER, Volker
Hundebreite 39
37697 Lauenförde / DE
03 / WELSH, Thomas
Schönburgstrasse 20
12103 Berlin / DE
Former [1997/10]01 / KOSSMANN, Jens
Koblenzer Strasse 1
10715 Berlin / DE
02 / BÜTTCHER, Volker
Hundebreite 39
37697 Lauenförde / DE
03 / WELSH, Thomas
Schönburgstrasse 20
12103 Berlin / DE
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/10]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date95920833.118.05.1995
[1997/10]
WO1995EP01893
Priority number, dateDE1994441787918.05.1994         Original published format: DE 4417879
DE1994444738822.12.1994         Original published format: DE 4447388
[1997/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9531553
Date:23.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0759993
Date:05.03.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.1995
[1997/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0759993
Date:25.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.11.1995
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/54, C12N15/82, C12N5/10, C12N1/21, C12N1/15, A01H5/00, C12P19/18, C12Q1/68
[1997/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/10]
TitleGerman:FÜR ENZYME, DIE DIE FÄHIGKEIT BESITZEN LINEARE ALPHA 1,4-GLUCANE IN PFLANZEN, PILZEN UND MIKROORGANISMEN ZU SYNTHESIEREN, KODIERENDE DNA SEQUENZEN[1997/10]
English:DNA SEQUENCES CODING FOR ENZYMES CAPABLE OF FACILITATING THE SYNTHESIS OF LINEAR ALPHA-1,4 GLUCANS IN PLANTS, FUNGI AND MICROORGANISMS[2007/16]
French:SEQUENCES D'ADN CODANT DES ENZYMES SUSCEPTIBLES DE FACILITER LA SYNTHESE D'ALPHA-1,4 GLYCANES LINEAIRES CHEZ LES VEGETAUX, LES CHAMPIGNONS ET LES MICRO-ORGANISMES[2007/16]
Former [1997/10]DNA SEQUENCES CODING FOR ENZYMES CAPABLE OF FACILITATING THE SYNTHESIS OF LINEAR $g(a)-1,4 GLUCANS IN PLANTS, FUNGI AND MICROORGANISMS
Former [1997/10]SEQUENCES D'ADN CODANT DES ENZYMES SUSCEPTIBLES DE FACILITER LA SYNTHESE D'$g(a)-1,4 GLYCANNES LINEAIRES CHEZ LES VEGETAUX, LES CHAMPIGNONS ET LES MICRO-ORGANISMES
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase29.10.1996National basic fee paid 
29.10.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.10.1996Examination requested  [1997/10]
22.06.1998Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
17.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2007Fee for grant paid
05.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
25.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 12
31.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 13
Cited inInternational search[PX]DE4420223  (INST GENBIOLOGISCHE FORSCHUNG [DE]) [PX] 1-4,6-8,12,13 * page 3, line 37 - line 62; claim 8 *;
 [DA]WO9214827  (INST GENBIOLOGISCHE FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DA] 1-21 * column W *;
 [A]WO9211375  (AMYLOGENE HB [SE]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO8912386  (CALGENE INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * examples 5-8 *;
 [A]WO9002484  (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]) [A] 1-21 * page 26, line 3 - line 13; examples 4,11 *;
 [A]DE4227061  (INST GENBIOLOGISCHE FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [DX]  - OKADA, G., ET AL., "NEW STUDIES ON AMYLOSUCRASE, A BACTERIAL ALPHA-D-GLUCOSYLASE THAT DIRECTLY CONVERTS SUCROSE TO A GLYCOGEN-LIKE ALPHA-GLUCAN", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, vol. 249, no. 1, pages 126 - 135, [DX] 8,20,21 * the whole document *
 [X]  - TAO, B.Y., ET AL., "NEISSERIA PERFLAVA AMYLOSUCRASE: CHARACTERIZATION OF ITS PRODUCT POLYSACCHARIDE AND A STUDY OF ITS INHIBITION BY SUCROSE DERIVATIVES", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, vol. 181, pages 163 - 174, [X] 8,20,21 * the whole document *
 [DX]  - MACKENZIE, C.R., ET AL., "GLYCOGEN METABOLISM IN THE GENUS NEISSERIA: SYNTHESIS FROM SUCROSE BY AMYLOSUCRASE", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 24, no. 4, pages 357 - 362, [DX] 8,20,21 * the whole document *
 [DX]  - MACKENZIE, C.R., ET AL., "GLYCOGEN SYNTHESIS BY AMYLOSUCRASE FROM NESSERIA PERFLAVA", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 23, no. 9, pages 1303 - 307, [DX] 8,20,21 * the whole document *
 [A]  - EBSKAMP, M.J.M., ET AL., "ACCUMULATION OF FRUCTOSE POLYMERS IN TRANSGENIC TOBACCO", BIOTECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK US, vol. 12, no. 3, pages 272 - 275, [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [A]  - VAN DER MEER, I.M, ET AL., "FRUCTAN AS A NEW CARBOHYDRATE SINK IN TRANSGENIC POTATO PLANTS", THE PLANT CELL, vol. 6, no. 4, pages 561 - 570, [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [A]  - VAN DER LEIJ, F.R., ET AL., "EXPRESSION OF THE GENE ENCODING GRANULE BOUND STARCH SYNTHASE AFTER INTRODUCTION IN AN AMYLOSE-FREE AND A WILDTYPE POTATO (SOLANUM TUBEROSUM)", IAPTC CONGRESS AMSTERDAM, JUNE 24-29, 1990., page 177, [A] 1-21 * see abstract A5-28 *