blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0762897

EP0762897 - METHOD OF PREVENTING AGGREGATION OF PROTEINS/PEPTIDES UPON REHYDRATION OR THAWING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/12]METHOD OF PREVENTING AGGREGATION OF VARIOUS SUBSTANCES UPON REHYDRATION OR THAWING AND COMPOSITIONS OBTAINED THEREBY
[2002/39]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  28.01.2011
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 20.07.2011  [2011/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Quadrant Drug Delivery Limited
1 Mere Way, Ruddington
Nottingham, NG11 6JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/27]For all designated states
Quadrant Drug Delivery Limited
1 Mere Way, Ruddington
Nottingham, NG11 6JS / GB
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Elan Drug Delivery Limited
1 Mere Way, Ruddington
Nottingham, NG11 6JS / GB
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Quadrant Healthcare (UK) Limited
1 Mere Way
Ruddington, Nottingham NG11 6JS / GB
Former [2001/48]For all designated states
QUADRANT HEALTHCARE (UK) LIMITED
Maris Lane
Trumpington, Cambridge CB2 2SY / GB
Former [1997/12]For all designated states
QUADRANT HOLDINGS CAMBRIDGE LIMITED
Maris Lane
Trumpington, Cambridge CB2 2SY / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ROSER, Bruce, Joseph
The Old Vicarage, Church Lanee, Balsham
Cambridge CB1 6DS / GB
02 / COLACO, Camilo
107 Foster Way, Trumpington
Cambridge CB2 2JN / GB
03 / KAMPINGA, Jaap
Rietveldlaan 35
NL-9731 MJ Groningen / NL
04 / SMITH, Christopher
37 A Woodend, Bluntisham
Huntingdon, Cambridgeshire PE17 3LE / GB
 [2003/14]
Former [1997/12]01 / ROSER, Bruce, Joseph
The Old Vicarage, Church Lanee, Balsham
Cambridge CB1 6DS / GB
02 / COLACO, Camilo
107 Foster Way, Trumpington
Cambridge CB2 2JN / GB
03 / KAMPINGA, Jaap
Grevingaheerd 9
NL-9737 SB Groningen / NL
04 / SMITH, Christopher
37 A Woodend, Bluntisham
Huntingdon, Cambridgeshire PE17 3LE / GB
Representative(s)Stevens, Ian Edward, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/19]Stevens, Ian Edward, et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [1999/13]Perry, Robert Edward
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [1997/12]Goldin, Douglas Michael
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date95921031.102.06.1995
[1997/12]
WO1995GB01277
Priority number, dateUS1994025296702.06.1994         Original published format: US 252967
[1997/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9533488
Date:14.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0762897
Date:19.03.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0762897
Date:02.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.1995
ClassificationIPC:A61K47/26, C07K1/00, C12N9/96
[1997/12]
CPC:
C07K14/61 (EP,US); A61K35/18 (EP,US); A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US); C07K1/00 (EP,US); Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/12]
Extension statesSI17.12.1996
TitleGerman:METHODE ZUM VERHINDERN DER AGGREGATION VON PROTEINEN/PEPTIDEN BEI REHYDRATATION ODER AUFTAUEN[2002/39]
English:METHOD OF PREVENTING AGGREGATION OF PROTEINS/PEPTIDES UPON REHYDRATION OR THAWING[2002/39]
French:PROCEDE PREVENANT L'AGGREGATION DE PROTEINES/PEPTIDES LORS DE REHYDRATATION ET DE DECONGELATION[2002/39]
Former [1997/12]METHODE ZUM VERHINDERN VON VERKLUMPUNG VERSCHIEDENER SUBSTANZEN NACH REHYDRATION ODER AUFTAUEN UND DABEI ERHALTENE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN
Former [1997/12]METHOD OF PREVENTING AGGREGATION OF VARIOUS SUBSTANCES UPON REHYDRATION OR THAWING AND COMPOSITIONS OBTAINED THEREBY
Former [1997/12]PROCEDE PREVENANT L'AGGREGATION DE DIFFERENTES SUBSTANCES LORS DE REHYDRATATIONS ET DE DECONGELATIONS, ET COMPOSITIONS OBTENUES
Entry into regional phase17.12.1996National basic fee paid 
17.12.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/12]
28.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2003Fee for grant paid
13.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.12.2003  13.01.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608-2917 / US
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Straße 23
80636 München / DE
 02  23.12.2003  16.04.2004  WITHDRAWN
National Blood Authority
Oak House, Reeds Crescent, Watford
Herfordshire WD1 1QH / GB
Opponent's representative
Beacham, Annabel Rose
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2007/16]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2003  13.01.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608-2917 / US
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus
Breuer & Müller Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Heimeranstrasse 35
80339 München / DE
 02  23.12.2003  16.04.2004  WITHDRAWN
National Blood Authority
Oak House, Reeds Crescent, Watford
Herfordshire WD1 1QH / GB
Opponent's representative
Beacham, Annabel Rose
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [2007/08]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2003  13.01.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Chiron Corporation
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, California 94608-2917 / US
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus
Breuer & Müller Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Heimeranstrasse 35
80339 München / DE
 02  23.12.2003  16.04.2004  WITHDRAWN
National Blood Authority
Oak House, Reeds Crescent, Watford
Herfordshire WD1 1QH / GB
Opponent's representative
Beacham, Annabel Rose
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [2004/24]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2003  13.01.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Chiron Corporation
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, California 94608-2917 / US
Opponent's representative
Voelker, Ingeborg Carla Emmy
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
 02  23.12.2003  16.04.2004  WITHDRAWN
National Blood Authority
Oak House, Reeds Crescent, Watford
Herfordshire WD1 1QH / GB
Opponent's representative
Beacham, Annabel Rose
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [2004/09]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2003   
Chiron Corporation
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, California 94608-2917 / US
Opponent's representative
Voelker, Ingeborg Carla Emmy
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
 02  23.12.2003    WITHDRAWN
National Blood Authority
Oak House, Reeds Crescent, Watford
Herfordshire WD1 1QH / GB
Opponent's representative
Beacham, Annabel Rose
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [2004/08]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2003   
Chiron Corporation
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, California 94608-2917 / US
Opponent's representative
Voelker, Ingeborg Carla Emmy
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
06.02.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.11.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.09.2006Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.11.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.01.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/09]
15.06.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition08.01.2006Appeal received No.  T0012/07
19.03.2007Statement of grounds filed
15.06.2010Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
22.12.2006Appeal received No.  T0012/07
09.03.2007Statement of grounds filed
15.06.2010Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
15.06.2010Date of oral proceedings
28.06.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH02.04.2003
LI02.04.2003
LU02.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
[2011/29]
Former [2010/05]LU02.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
Former [2008/12]MC30.06.2007
Cited inInternational search[DYX]US4891319  (ROSER BRUCE J [GB]) [DY] 1-27 * the whole document * [X] 22-26;
 [X]WO9004329  (COULTER CORP [US]) [X] 1-27 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 4, line 1 - line 29 * * page 7, line 20 - line 30; claims 12-16 *;
 [X]WO9013637  (HYGEIA SCIENCES LTD [US]) [X] 1-27 * page 16, line 20 - page 17, line 9 *;
 [DYX]US5026566  (ROSER BRUCE J [GB]) [DY] 1-27 * the whole document * [X] 22-26;
 [X]US5242792  (RUDOLPH ALAN S [US], et al) [X] 1-27* column 3 - column 4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.