Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0759826

EP0759826 - TOOL HOLDER WITH A CLAMP FOR APERTURED INSERTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  19.09.2008
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[2002/31]
Former [1997/10]For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Inventor(s)01 / TJERNSTRÖM, Eric
Kungsbäcksvägen 33
S-802 67 Gävle / SE
[1997/10]
Representative(s)Lieke, Winfried , et al
WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98
65185 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/44]Lieke, Winfried, Dr. , et al
Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45
65051 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [1997/10]Taquist, Lennart , et al
Sandvik AB Patent Department
811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE
Application number, filing date95921204.424.05.1995
[1997/10]
WO1995SE00595
Priority number, dateSE1994000182227.05.1994         Original published format: SE 9401822
[1997/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9532829
Date:07.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0759826
Date:05.03.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995
[1997/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0759826
Date:31.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/31]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0759826
Date:22.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE07.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:B23B7/16, // B23B29/04
[1997/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1997/10]
TitleGerman:WERKZEUGHALTER MIT SPANNEINRICHTUNG FÜR SCHNEIDEINSÄTZEN MIT OFFNUNGEN[1997/10]
English:TOOL HOLDER WITH A CLAMP FOR APERTURED INSERTS[1997/10]
French:PORTE-OUTIL A BRIDE DE FIXATION POUR PLAQUETTES AMOVIBLES A OUVERTURE[1997/10]
Entry into regional phase22.10.1996National basic fee paid 
22.10.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
22.10.1996Examination requested  [1997/10]
29.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2002Fee for grant paid
26.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
24.07.2007Observations by third parties
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.03.2003  08.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Kennametal Inc.
PO Box 231
Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US
Opponent's representative
Sties, Jochen
Prinz & Partner GbR
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
 02  30.04.2003  14.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Toshiba Tungaloy Co., Ltd
Solid Square 580, Horikawa-cjo,Saiwa-ku
Kawasaki City 212-8503 / JP
Opponent's representative
Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2009/42]
Opponent(s)01  21.03.2003  08.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Kennametal Inc.
PO Box 231
Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US
Opponent's representative
Sties, Jochen
Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
 02  30.04.2003  14.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Toshiba Tungaloy Co., Ltd
Solid Square 580, Horikawa-cjo,Saiwa-ku
Kawasaki City 212-8503 / JP
Opponent's representative
Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Former [2003/27]
Opponent(s)01  21.03.2003  08.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
KENNAMETAL INC.
PO Box 231
Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US
Opponent's representative
Sties, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte, Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
 02  30.04.2003  14.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Toshiba Tungaloy Co., Ltd
Solid Square 580, Horikawa-cjo,Saiwa-ku
Kawasaki City 212-8503 / JP
Opponent's representative
Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Former [2003/20]
Opponent(s)01  21.03.2003  08.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
KENNAMETAL INC.
PO Box 231
Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US
Opponent's representative
Sties, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte, Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
05.06.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.12.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.09.2005Date of oral proceedings
11.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
11.10.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.12.2005Reply to a communication from the opposition division
03.04.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.05.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.06.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
05.09.2008Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition05.07.2006Appeal received No.  T1034/06
21.09.2006Statement of grounds filed
03.04.2008Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
03.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
08.04.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:29.04.2002Request for further processing filed
02.05.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.06.2002Decision despatched
11.05.1999Request for further processing filed
11.05.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.06.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0402934  ;
 [A]US3837058  ;
 [A]DE4209084  ;
 [A]DE3709135  ;
 [A]US3577618
otherDE1950719
 EP0398363
OppositionSU1565593