Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0759826 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0759826



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 735
12.04.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
11.09.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
13.10.2008 Text intended for grant Opposition 5
24.09.2008 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
24.09.2008 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
24.09.2008 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
19.09.2008 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
05.09.2008 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
05.09.2008 French translation of claims Opposition 2
05.09.2008 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
10.06.2008 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
10.06.2008 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
10.06.2008 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
10.06.2008 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
29.05.2008 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
19.05.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.05.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.05.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.05.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 24
08.04.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
03.04.2008 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 7
25.03.2008 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
19.03.2008 Claims Appeal 1
19.03.2008 Claims Appeal 2
19.03.2008 Claims Appeal 2
19.03.2008 Claims Appeal 1
19.03.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
19.03.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
18.03.2008 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2008 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2008 Claims Appeal 2
18.03.2008 Claims Appeal 1
18.03.2008 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 3
18.03.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
18.03.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
17.03.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.03.2008 Non-scannable object Appeal 3
17.03.2008 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.03.2008 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 3
06.03.2008 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 3
04.03.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
03.03.2008 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
28.02.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.02.2008 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 7
24.01.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
21.01.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.01.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.01.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
14.12.2007 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
03.08.2007 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
03.08.2007 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 3
24.07.2007 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 33
07.02.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
02.02.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
01.02.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
29.09.2006 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.09.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.09.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
12.07.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
07.07.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
05.07.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
18.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.05.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.05.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.05.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.05.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
11.05.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
11.05.2006 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.05.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.05.2006 Text intended for grant Opposition 5
14.12.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.10.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
11.10.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
11.10.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
11.10.2005 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
11.10.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.10.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.10.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
11.10.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
11.10.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
11.10.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.08.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2005 Claims Opposition 2
18.08.2005 Claims Opposition 2
18.08.2005 Claims Opposition 2
18.08.2005 Claims Opposition 2
18.08.2005 Claims Opposition 2
18.08.2005 Claims Opposition 2
18.08.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
17.08.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
17.08.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 16
17.08.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
04.08.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.08.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.07.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.07.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.07.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.02.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.02.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.02.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.02.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.02.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.02.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.02.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
07.02.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 3
31.01.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.01.2005 Claims Opposition 2
14.01.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
24.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
04.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.05.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.12.2003 Claims Opposition 1
24.12.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
23.12.2003 Claims Opposition 1
23.12.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
20.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.10.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
13.10.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.09.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
05.09.2003 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
05.09.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.08.2003 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
05.06.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.06.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.06.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
19.05.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.05.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.05.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 18
05.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
05.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
05.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
05.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.05.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
30.04.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
30.04.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
11.04.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.03.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
21.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
21.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
21.03.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.06.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.06.2002 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
02.05.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
02.05.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
02.05.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
02.05.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
02.05.2002 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
02.05.2002 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
02.05.2002 Translation of priority document Search / examination 7
29.04.2002 Request for further processing Search / examination 8
22.04.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
22.04.2002 Communication concerning missing translation(s) of priority document(s) Search / examination 1
28.02.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.02.2002 Translation of priority document Search / examination 7
28.02.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
28.02.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
07.12.2001 Filing of a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
07.12.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
01.12.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.11.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.11.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
22.11.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
07.08.2001 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
23.03.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
23.03.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
20.03.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 5
20.03.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 4
05.12.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 8
17.05.2000 Annex Search / examination 1
17.05.2000 Claims Search / examination 2
17.05.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
14.12.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.12.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
05.10.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.06.1999 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
14.05.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
14.05.1999 Description Search / examination 1
14.05.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.05.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
11.03.1999 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
29.09.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.01.1997 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.11.1996 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.10.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.10.1996 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.09.1996 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
13.02.1996 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.02.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 13
07.12.1995 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
07.12.1995 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 12
07.12.1995 Priority document Search / examination 10