Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0762851

EP0762851 - INTERCONDYLAR NOTCH CUTTER FOR POSTERIOR STABILIZED FEMORAL KNEE PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2001
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE
published on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SULZER ORTHOPEDICS INC.
9900 Spectrum Drive
Austin, TX 78717 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Sulzer Orthopedics Inc.
9900 Spectrum Drive
Austin, TX 78717 / US
Former [1997/12]For all designated states
INTERMEDICS ORTHOPEDICS, INC.
9900 Spectrum Drive
Austin, Texas 78717 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VINCIGUERRA, John, D.
8500-A Mesa Drive
Austin, TX 78759 / US
02 / PERRONE, Charles, H., Jr.
109 Buck Lane
Georgetown, TX 78628 / US
03 / MUMME, Charles, W.
13005 Humphrey Drive
Austin, TX 78729 / US
04 / HIGGINS, Jeffery, C.
3401 Red River, No. 34
Austin, TX 78705 / US
[1997/12]
Representative(s)Sulzer Management AG
Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14
8401 Winterthur / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Sulzer Management AG
KS/Patente/0007 Zürcherstrasse 14
8401 Winterthur / CH
Former [1997/12]Hammer, Bruno Dr. , et al
Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 12
8401 Winterthur / CH
Application number, filing date95921484.226.05.1995
[1997/12]
WO1995US06786
Priority number, dateUS1994025268902.06.1994         Original published format: US 252689
[1997/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9533414
Date:14.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0762851
Date:19.03.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1995
[1997/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0762851
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/17
[1997/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1997/12]
TitleGerman:SCHNEIDGERÄT FÜR DIE FEMORALE INTERKONDYLÄRE NUT EINER VON HINTEN STABILISIERTEN KNIEPROTHESE[1999/24]
English:INTERCONDYLAR NOTCH CUTTER FOR POSTERIOR STABILIZED FEMORAL KNEE PROSTHESIS[1997/12]
French:INSTRUMENT SERVANT A PRATIQUER UNE ENTAILLE INTERCONDYLIENNE POUR UNE PROTHESE FEMORALE POSTERIEURE STABILISEE DU GENOU[1997/12]
Former [1997/12]SCHNEIDGERÄT FÜR DIE FEMORALE INTERKONDYLÄRE NUT EINER VON HINTEN STABILISIERTENKNIEPROTHESE
Entry into regional phase20.12.1996National basic fee paid 
20.12.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/12]
30.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
15.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
12.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2000Fee for grant paid
10.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27]
Request for further processing for:15.05.1998Request for further processing filed
15.05.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.05.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
04.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL19.07.2000
SE19.10.2000
[2003/09]
Former [2002/13]SE19.10.2000
DE20.10.2000
Former [2001/27]SE19.10.2000
Cited inInternational search[DX]US5176684  (FERRANTE JOSEPH M [US], et al) [DX] 1-18,22,23 * abstract *;
 [DX]US5098436  (FERRANTE JOSEPH M [US], et al) [DX] 1-18,22,23 * column 3, line 4 - line 18; figures 1,5,9 * * column 3, line 50 - line 60 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 9 *;
 [A]US4721104  (KAUFMAN MICHAEL E [US], et al) [A] 1,3,10,11,22 * column 7, line 67 - column 8, line 29; figures 1,6,15 *;
 [DA]US5100409  (COATES BRADLEY J [US], et al) [DA] 1-18,22,23 * abstract *