Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0767764

EP0767764 - PLANT FOR HEAT TREATMENT OF LUMPY MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F.L. Smidth & Co. A/S
77 Vigerslev Allé DK-2500 Valby
Copenhagen / DK
[N/P]
Former [1997/16]For all designated states
F.L. Smidth & Co. A/S
77 Vigerslev Allé
DK-2500 Valby, Copenhagen / DK
Inventor(s)01 / OLBYE, Bendt
Vigerslev Allé 77
DK-2500 Valby / DK
02 / MAERSK, Bent
Vigerslev Allé 77
DK-2500 Valby / DK
[1997/16]
Representative(s)Jackson, Peter Arthur
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/16]Jackson, Peter Arthur
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date95921725.801.06.1995
[1997/16]
WO1995DK00216
Priority number, dateDK1994000077529.06.1994         Original published format: DK 77594
[1997/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9600703
Date:11.01.1996
Language:EN
[1996/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0767764
Date:16.04.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1996
[1997/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0767764
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE11.01.1996
ClassificationInternational:C04B7/38, C04B7/44
[1997/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/16]
TitleGerman:ANLAGE ZUR THERMISCHEN BEHANDLUNG VON STÜCKIGEM MATERIAL[1997/16]
English:PLANT FOR HEAT TREATMENT OF LUMPY MATERIAL[1997/16]
French:INSTALLATION POUR UN TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE DE MATERIAUX EN MORCEAUX[1997/16]
Entry into regional phase17.01.1997National basic fee paid 
17.01.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
17.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/16]
21.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.1999Fee for grant paid
13.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0222044