Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0766918

EP0766918 - HERBICIDE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  02.08.2002
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.09.2002  [2002/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
7-1, Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/15]For all designated states
NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
7-1, Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ITO, Yoichi Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1470
Seibutsukagaku Kenkyusho Oaza-shiraoka, Shiraoka
machi Minamisaitama-gun Saitama 349-02 / JP
02 / SUDO, Kazuhisa Nissan Chem. Ind., Ltd. 14-70
Seibutsukagaku Kenkyusho Oaza-shiraoka, Shiraoka-
machi Minamisaitama-gun Saitama 349-02 / JP
03 / NAWAMAKI, Tsutomu Nissan Chem. Ind., Ltd. 1470
Seibutsukagaku Kenkyusho Oaza-shiraoka, Shiraoka-
machi Minamisaitama-gun Saitama 349-02 / JP
04 / MAKINO, Kenzi Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd.
Central Research Institute 722-1, Tsuboi-cho
Funabashi-shi Chiba 274 / JP
[1997/15]
Representative(s)Wächtershäuser, Günter
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwälte
Ottostrasse 4
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/15]Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr.
Patentanwalt, Tal 29
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date95922741.422.06.1995
[1997/15]
WO1995JP01251
Priority number, dateJP1994014144523.06.1994         Original published format: JP 14144594
[1997/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9600009
Date:04.01.1996
Language:EN
[1996/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0766918
Date:09.04.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.1996
[1997/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.01.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01N47/36, // (A01N47/36, 47:22, 43:707, 43:58, 43:12)
[2000/02]
Former International [1997/15]A01N47/36
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/15]
TitleGerman:HERBIZID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[1997/15]
English:HERBICIDE COMPOSITION[1997/15]
French:HERBICIDE[1997/15]
Entry into regional phase13.12.1996Translation filed 
13.12.1996National basic fee paid 
13.12.1996Search fee paid 
13.12.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
13.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/15]
29.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
16.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/38]
26.04.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
18.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPH05229907  ;
 [A]JPH05262609  ;
 [A]JPH05339112